Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-01769
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Apr 21, 2022 4:37 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
2345 Rice Street Suite 230
Roseville, MN 55113
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
ARAEO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
NATHAN BILBREY
Represented By
VINCENT JOSEPH MOCCIO
Bennerotte & Associates Pa - Eagan Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
6 6 misc Docket Annotation Wed 10/27 10:38 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: When opening a new civil case into MDL 2885, please choose Origin Code 8 Multidistrict Litigation - Direct File, not 1 Original Proceeding . If origin code 8 is not selected the incorrect judges are assigned to the Civil Case. Origin code number "8" is also the option to choose on the civil cover sheet. Please also choose Pensacola Division when opening the case. (djb)
Related: [-]
5 5 transfer Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 10/27 10:33 AM
Case transferred in from Gainesville Division Division on 10/27/2021 Case Number 1:21-cv-173. (djb)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order Wed 10/27 10:25 AM
ORDER. The Clerk is hereby directed to assign all actions filed in, removed to, or transferred to this district which relate to, or seek damages from use of, the 3M Combat Arms Earplugs to the undersigned in the Pensacola Division. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/23/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Create Case Association Wed 10/27 10:34 AM
Cases associated: Create association to 3:19-md-02885-MCR-GRJ. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
3 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 23, 2021
2 2 NOTICE of designated forum by nathan bilbrey re1 Complaint, (MOCCIO, VINCENT)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, ARAEO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6508082.), filed by nathan bilbrey. (MOCCIO, VINCENT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet