Hawk Innovative Tech, LLC v. United States of America
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy C Batten, Sr |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-00188 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Oct 27, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2022 |
Case in other court: | USCA- 11th Circuit, 22-10767-BB |
Last checked: Monday Apr 25, 2022 4:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hawk Innovative Tech, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, November 14, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 11/14 1:46 PM
Certified copy of MANDATE of USCA AFFIRMING the decision of the District Court7 Notice of Appeal filed by Hawk Innovative Tech, LLC Case Appealed to USCA 11th Circuit Case Number 22-10767 (dmb) |
|
Thursday, September 22, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
USCA Opinion
Thu 09/22 12:22 PM
USCA Opinion received (AFFIRMED) re:7 Notice of Appeal filed by Hawk Innovative Tech, LLC. In accordance with FRAP 41(b), the USCA mandate will issue at a later date. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 22-10767 BB. (pjm) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2022 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Certified
Fri 05/06 10:43 AM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal,7 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA 11th Circuit Case Number 22-10767 BB. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (dmb) |
||
Monday, March 14, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
USCA Acknowledgment
Tue 03/15 12:37 PM
USCA Acknowledgment of7 Notice of Appeal filed by Hawk Innovative Tech, LLC. Case Appealed to USCA 11th Circuit Case Number 22-10767 BB (dmb) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Wed 03/02 2:20 PM
Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Clerk's Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re7 Notice of Appeal (dmb) |
|
8 | 8
appeal
USCA Appeal Transmission
Wed 03/02 2:18 PM
USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to USCA 11th Circuit re:7 Notice of Appeal filed by Hawk Innovative Tech, LLC. (dmb) |
|
Monday, February 28, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 02/28 9:40 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to5 Order on Motion to Dismiss,6 Clerk's Judgment by Hawk Innovative Tech, LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AGANDC-11620384. Transcript Order Form due on 3/14/2022 (Monroe, John) |
|
Wednesday, January 26, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 01/26 8:56 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (dmb) |
|
Tuesday, January 25, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 01/26 8:55 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 1/25/2022. (dmb) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 01/26 8:59 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (dmb) |
||
Friday, January 21, 2022 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Fri 01/21 2:19 PM
Submission of3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (dmb) |
||
Monday, January 03, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
8
pgs
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 01/03 12:56 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Hank Innovative Tech, LLC.(Monroe, John) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs Affidavit Declaration of John Monroe | ||
Thursday, December 23, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Thu 12/23 12:59 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by United States of America.(Smith, Cynthia) |
|
Att: 1 11 pgs Brief In Support, | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 27, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 10/27 3:14 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to United States of America. (jkb) |
|
1 | 1
4
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/27 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Hank Innovative Tech, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11354822)(jkb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |