New York Western District Court
Judge:Lawrence J Vilardo
Case #: 1:21-cv-01155
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2021
Terminated:Nov 22, 2021

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, November 19, 2021
4 4 order Text Order Fri 11/19 3:52 PM
TEXT ORDER: The pro se petitioner, Gregory A. Hubbard, filed a petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2241, Docket Item 1, seeking his immediate release, id. at 3. Because Hubbard is in state custody pursuant to a sentence imposed by a state court, this Court construed his petition as having been brought under 28 U.S.C. § 2254. Docket Item 2. Before converting Hubbard's petition into one under section 2254, however, the Court gave Hubbard an opportunity to withdraw his petition because of the restrictions imposed on "second or successive" petitions brought under that section. Id. at 3-4 (citing 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b)). Hubbard now has moved to withdraw his petition. Docket Item 3. That motion is GRANTED, and the petition is dismissed without prejudice. Hubbard is warned, however, that failure to refile his petition within the one-year limitations period under 28 U.S.C. § 2244(d)(1) may result in the dismissal of his petition as time barred. The Court also notes that the one-year limitations period was not tolled while this petition was pending. See Duncan v. Walker , 533 U.S. 167 (2001). The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/19/2021. (Chambers mailed a copy of this text order to the pro se petitioner.) (WMH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
3 3 motion Withdraw Wed 11/17 3:52 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Petition by Gregory A. Hubbard.(SG)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
2 2 5 pgs order Order Mon 11/08 10:37 AM
ORDER that Hubbard shall inform this Court in writing if he wishes to withdraw his petition within 30 days of the date of this order. If Hubbard does not withdraw his petition, the Court will convert the petition into one filed under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 and the Clerk of the Court shall update the caption accordingly. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/8/2021. (CGJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
utility Remark Wed 10/27 12:39 PM
Pro Se Packet Mailed to Plaintiff which included: Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, Civil Case Timeline.(SG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 10/27 12:35 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Gregory A. Hubbard. Receipt ROC013156, $5.00.(SG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 envelope,
Att: 3 receipt