Arizona District Court
Judge:Steven P Logan
Case #: 2:21-cv-01813
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2021
Terminated:Feb 05, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 25, 2022 2:00 AM MST
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Kristina Louise Morrison
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachel Alder
Represented By
Theodore A Julian, Jr.
Burch & Cracchiolo PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Biggs
Represented By
Theodore A Julian, Jr.
Burch & Cracchiolo PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeremy Biggs
Represented By
Theodore A Julian, Jr.
Burch & Cracchiolo PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Joel Biggs
Represented By
Theodore A Julian, Jr.
Burch & Cracchiolo PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathan Biggs
Represented By
Theodore A Julian, Jr.
Burch & Cracchiolo PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas Biggs
Represented By
Theodore A Julian, Jr.
Burch & Cracchiolo PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Esther Brown
Represented By
Theodore A Julian, Jr.
Burch & Cracchiolo PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Estate of Susan Hiatt Biggs
Represented By
Theodore A Julian, Jr.
Burch & Cracchiolo PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Estate of Thomas Worth Biggs
Represented By
Theodore A Julian, Jr.
Burch & Cracchiolo PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Rebecca Evans
Represented By
Theodore A Julian, Jr.
Burch & Cracchiolo PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Richins
Represented By
Theodore A Julian, Jr.
Burch & Cracchiolo PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, February 05, 2024
71 71 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 02/05 4:51 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re: Stipulation to Dismiss (Doc.70 ). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/5/24. (MJW)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
70 70 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 02/02 1:35 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by United States of America.(Tinsley, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order