California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:21-cr-03010
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2021
Terminated:Feb 21, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Oct 28, 2021 12:32 AM PDT
Defendant
Victor Manuel Robles (1)
Represented By
Keith Rutman
contact info
Samantha B. Jaffe
San Diego Federal Defenders, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jessica Schulberg
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Nov 17 2021
ORDER Granting 20 Joint Motion to Continue Motion Hearing/Trial Setting as to Victor Manuel Robles (1). The Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 11/24/2021 is continued to 1/7/2022 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 4D before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. The Court finds that time is excluded in the interests of justice and pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(1)(D). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/17/2021. (tcf)
GPO May 23 2022
ORDER Granting 36 Joint Motion to Withdraw Guilty Plea as to Victor Manuel Robles (1). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/23/2022. (tcf)
GPO May 25 2022
ORDER Vacating Sentencing Hearing, Setting Status Hearing and Granting Joint Motion to Declare Time Excluded Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Victor Manuel Robles. Pursuant to joint motion and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, in the interest of justice, to allow time for an Application for the Military Veteran's Diversion Program to be completed, the Sentencing Hearing scheduled for 5/27/2022 shall be VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Status Hearing re: Veteran's Diversion Court shall be held on Friday, 8/12/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4D before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Time is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/25/2022. (tcf)

Docket last updated: 02/24/2024 1:28 PM PST
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
Arrest of Victor Manuel Robles (no document attached) (cdw) [3:21-mj-03936-BLM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Victor Manuel Robles.(cdw) [3:21-mj-03936-BLM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Victor Manuel Robles: Initial Appearance set for 9/29/2021 before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. (no document attached) (lrc) [3:21-mj-03936-BLM]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Status Hearing re Initial Appearance as to Victor Manuel Robles held on 9/29/2021. Defendant not appearing. Rule 5 objection noted and overruled. ( Initial Appearance set for 9/30/2021 before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major.) (CD# 9/29/2021 BLM 2:17-2:22;4:14-4:14;4:19-4:21). (Plaintiff Attorney Amy Brammell AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Payam Fakharara FD-S/A). (no document attached) (aje) [3:21-mj-03936-BLM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
4 4 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Victor Manuel Robles:( Initial Appearance set for 9/30/2021 before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major.) (no document attached) (mme) [3:21-mj-03936-BLM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ***WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT per notice6 *** NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Samantha B. Jaffe appearing for Victor Manuel Robles (Jaffe, Samantha)Attorney Samantha B. Jaffe added to party Victor Manuel Robles(pty:dft) (ggv). [3:21-mj-03936-BLM]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT filed by Victor Manuel Robles (Jaffe, Samantha) (ggv). [3:21-mj-03936-BLM]
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Initial Appearance as to Victor Manuel Robles held on 9/30/2021. Appointed Attorney Keith Rutman(n/a) for Victor Manuel Robles. Bond set as to Victor Manuel Robles (1) $20,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA and $1,000 cash deposit. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 10/14/21 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Arraignment set for 10/26/21 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. ) (CD# 9/30/2021 BLM 21-1:2:29-3:11). (Plaintiff Attorney Amy Brammell AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Chloe Dillon FD-S/A). (aje) [3:21-mj-03936-BLM]
Related: [-]
8 8 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Victor Manuel Robles (no document attached) (aje) [3:21-mj-03936-BLM]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Victor Manuel Robles (axc) [3:21-mj-03936-BLM]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Victor Manuel Robles (1) $20,000 P/S.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 09/30/2021. (ggv) (dsn) [3:21-mj-03936-BLM]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER as to Victor Manuel Robles: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/30/21. (aje) [3:21-mj-03936-BLM]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
12 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jessica Schulberg appearing for USA. (Schulberg, Jessica)Attorney Jessica Schulberg added to party USA(pty:pla) (jms). [3:21-mj-03936-BLM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
13 13 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 by Victor Manuel Robles (Rutman, Keith)(jms). [3:21-mj-03936-BLM]
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s): Preliminary Hearing is vacated re13 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1. (no document attached) (nbp) [3:21-mj-03936-BLM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
15 15 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Schulberg, Jessica) (ggv). [3:21-mj-03936-BLM]
Related: [-]
16 16 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING (TIME + JUDGE) as to Defendant Victor Manuel Robles. On the Court's own motion, Arraignment reset for 10/26/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. (nbp) [3:21-mj-03936-BLM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
17 17 1 pgs INFORMATION as to Victor Manuel Robles (1) count(s) 1. (tcf)
Related: [-]
18 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Arraignment on Information as to Victor Manuel Robles (1) Count 1 held on 10/26/2021. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 11/24/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. (CD# 10/26/2021 KSC 923-936). (Plaintiff Attorney Julie Bauman AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Robert Garcia CJA). (ecf)
Related: [-]