PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY v. Smith et al
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Leslie Abrams Gardner |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00201 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 28, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 01, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 26, 2022 5:05 AM EDT |
Petitioner
PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
ALPHONZA BOWENS
|
|
Respondent
L & B TRANSPORT LLC
432 PINECREST ST
BROXTON, GA 31519 |
Represented By
|
Respondent
JUSTIN DEION SMITH
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 01, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
order
Judgment
Wed 06/01 10:48 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY against L & B TRANSPORT LLC, ALPHONZA BOWENS, JUSTIN DEION SMITH. (mdm) |
|
Tuesday, May 31, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tue 05/31 1:27 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Default Judgment. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter judgment against Respondents. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 05/31/2022. (mdm) |
|
Thursday, January 06, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Default Judgment
Thu 01/06 1:48 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Respondent Justin Dieon Smith, Respondent L & B Transport, LLC and Respondent Alphonza Bowens. by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY filed by JENA GRACE EMORY.(EMORY, JENA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Brief in Support | ||
order
Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 01/06 9:36 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ALPHONZA BOWENS, L & B TRANSPORT LLC, JUSTIN DEION SMITH - Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment within 21 days. The motion for default judgment shall state whether a hearing is necessary to determine damages, and if a hearing is not necessary, the motion shall include all evidence supporting the damages sought in the motion and a proposed order granting the motion. Failure to comply with this notice may result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. (mdm) |
||
Wednesday, January 05, 2022 | ||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Wed 01/05 4:23 PM
Notice of Deficiency ; Case Administrator Deficiency. Review request by Chambers was entered in error.(mdm) |
||
Monday, January 03, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 01/03 1:49 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney VICTORIA E MUNIAN terminated. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 01/03/2022. (mdm) |
|
Wednesday, December 29, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 12/29 11:32 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by L & B TRANSPORT LLC filed by VICTORIA E MUNIAN.(MUNIAN, VICTORIA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Correspondence to L and B, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Wed 12/29 10:51 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; Document must be re-filed to add the Exhibits as Attachments to the Motion and must include a description of said attachment(s). A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. An example of a properly identified attachment would be Exhibit A Letter from A. Hamilton to A. Burr. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 13.(mdm) |
||
Tuesday, December 28, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 12/28 3:43 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by L & B TRANSPORT LLC filed by VICTORIA E MUNIAN.(MUNIAN, VICTORIA) |
|
Monday, December 27, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default
Mon 12/27 11:24 AM
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against L & B TRANSPORT LLC (EMORY, JENA) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default
Mon 12/27 11:23 AM
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against JUSTIN DEION SMITH (EMORY, JENA) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default
Mon 12/27 11:22 AM
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against ALPHONZA BOWENS (EMORY, JENA) |
|
Wednesday, December 22, 2021 | ||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Wed 12/22 11:16 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Application to Clerk for Entry of Default.(mdm) |
||
Tuesday, December 21, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling/Discovery Order
Tue 12/21 5:01 PM
SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER :Discovery to be complete by 6/20/2022. Dispositive motions due by 7/19/2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 12/21/2021.(mdm) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling & Discovery Order | ||
13 | 13
motion
Entry of Default
Tue 12/21 10:11 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Respondent Justin Deion Smith by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY filed by JENA GRACE EMORY.(EMORY, JENA) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Entry of Default
Tue 12/21 10:10 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Respondent L & B Transport, LLC by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY filed by JENA GRACE EMORY.(EMORY, JENA) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Entry of Default
Tue 12/21 10:10 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Respondent Alphonza Bowens by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY filed by JENA GRACE EMORY.(EMORY, JENA) |
|
Monday, December 20, 2021 | ||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Mon 12/20 10:28 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; Wrong event used. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager. The correct event is Certificate of Service.(mdm) |
||
Friday, December 17, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 12/17 4:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY as to JUSTIN DEION SMITH. (EMORY, JENA) |
|
Monday, November 29, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 11/30 11:20 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 11/29/2021. (mdm) |
|
Wednesday, November 24, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
6
pgs
order
Order - Rules 16/26
Wed 11/24 12:27 PM
RULES 16/26 ORDER :Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/27/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 11/24/2021.(far) |
|
Att: 1 Required Form | ||
Monday, November 22, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 11/22 5:30 PM
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by L & B TRANSPORT LLC filed by VICTORIA E MUNIAN.(MUNIAN, VICTORIA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Consent Order | ||
Friday, November 05, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit
Fri 11/05 2:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Respondent Alphonza Bowens by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY (EMORY, JENA) |
|
Thursday, November 04, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Affidavit
Thu 11/04 2:58 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Respondent L & B Transport by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY (EMORY, JENA) |
|
Friday, October 29, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 10/29 9:46 AM
Summons Issued as to ALPHONZA BOWENS, L & B TRANSPORT LLC, JUSTIN DEION SMITH.(mdm) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
3 | 3
misc
Jurisdictional Statement
Fri 10/29 9:44 AM
Jurisdictional Statement by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY (EMORY, JENA) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Fri 10/29 9:19 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; In diversity cases, a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. Please file the required statement immediately. See Local Rule 87.2.(mdm) |
||
Thursday, October 28, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 10/28 12:11 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION, Corporate Parent DRIVE INSURANCE HOLDINGS INC for PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY. (EMORY, JENA) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Complaint
Thu 10/28 12:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Alphonza Bowens, L & B Transport, LLC, Justin Deion Smith Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3934941, $402 filed by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY(EMORY, JENA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A- DJA Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Summons of Justin Smith, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Summons of L & B Transport, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Summons of Alphonza Bowens, | ||
Att: 6 Required Form Jurisdictional Statement |