California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 3:21-cv-08378
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed Question: Fed Communications Act of 1934
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2021
Terminated:Jun 07, 2022
Case in other court:Florida Southern, 1:21-cv-22441 U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, 22-15961
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 26, 2022 1:32 AM PDT
Defendant
Jack Dorsey
Represented By
Thomas G. Sprankling
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Patrick J. Carome
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Ari Holtzblatt
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Peter W. Homer
Homer Bonner Jacobs, P.A.
contact info
Felicia Ellsworth
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
Twitter Inc.
Represented By
Thomas G. Sprankling
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Patrick J. Carome
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Ari Holtzblatt
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Peter W. Homer
Homer Bonner Jacobs, P.A.
contact info
Felicia Ellsworth
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Interested Party
United States of America
Michael Cosentino PO Box 129
Alameda, CA 94501
Represented By
Joshua Kolsky
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Joshua Michael Kolsky
Department Of Justice
contact info
Indraneel Sur
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
American Conservative Union
INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE CLASS 815 Ponce De Leon Blvd Third Floor
Coral Gables, FL 33134
Represented By
Credence Elizabeth Sol
Armenta And Sol, PC
contact info
Matthew Lee Baldwin
Vargas Gonzalez Hevia Baldwin, LLP
contact info
Michael J. Jones
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Andrei Dan Popovici
Law Office Of Andrei D. Popovici, P.C.
contact info
Frank C. Dudenhefer
contact info
Sean M. Hamill
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
John P Coale
contact info
Marie L. Fiala
Marie L Fiala
contact info
Roland A. Paul
Ivey Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Ryan Tougias
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
John P. Coale
contact info
Frank C. Dudenhefer, Jr.
The Dudenhefer Law Firm L.L.C
contact info
Richard Polk Lawson
Gardner Brewer Hudson, P.A.
contact info
John Q. Kelly
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda Cuadros
Represented By
Roland A. Paul
Ivey Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Ryan Tougias
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Matthew Lee Baldwin
Vargas Gonzalez Hevia Baldwin, LLP
contact info
Michael J. Jones
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
John P. Coale
contact info
Andrei Dan Popovici
Law Office Of Andrei D. Popovici, P.C.
contact info
Frank C. Dudenhefer, Jr.
The Dudenhefer Law Firm L.L.C
contact info
Sean M. Hamill
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
John P Coale
contact info
John Q. Kelly
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Marie L. Fiala
Marie L Fiala
contact info
Plaintiff
President Donald J. Trump
the Forty-Fifth President of the United States 1600 Pennsylvania Ave NW
Washington DC, DC 20500
Represented By
Roland A. Paul
Ivey Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Ryan Tougias
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Matthew Lee Baldwin
Vargas Gonzalez Hevia Baldwin, LLP
contact info
Michael J. Jones
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
John P. Coale
contact info
Andrei Dan Popovici
Law Office Of Andrei D. Popovici, P.C.
contact info
Frank C. Dudenhefer, Jr.
The Dudenhefer Law Firm L.L.C
contact info
Sean M. Hamill
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
John P Coale
contact info
John Q. Kelly
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Marie L. Fiala
Marie L Fiala
contact info
Plaintiff
Rafael Barbosa
Represented By
Credence Elizabeth Sol
Armenta And Sol, PC
contact info
Matthew Lee Baldwin
Vargas Gonzalez Hevia Baldwin, LLP
contact info
Maria Cristina Armenta
Armenta & Sol, PC
contact info
Michael J. Jones
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Andrei Dan Popovici
Law Office Of Andrei D. Popovici, P.C.
contact info
Frank C. Dudenhefer
contact info
Sean M. Hamill
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
John P Coale
contact info
Marie L. Fiala
Marie L Fiala
contact info
Roland A. Paul
Ivey Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Ryan Tougias
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Richard Polk Lawson
Gardner Brewer Hudson, P.A.
contact info
John Q. Kelly
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Plaintiff
Dominick Latella
Represented By
Credence Elizabeth Sol
Armenta And Sol, PC
contact info
Matthew Lee Baldwin
Vargas Gonzalez Hevia Baldwin, LLP
contact info
Maria Cristina Armenta
Armenta & Sol, PC
contact info
Michael J. Jones
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Andrei Dan Popovici
Law Office Of Andrei D. Popovici, P.C.
contact info
Frank C. Dudenhefer
contact info
Sean M. Hamill
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
John P Coale
contact info
Marie L. Fiala
Marie L Fiala
contact info
Roland A. Paul
Ivey Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Ryan Tougias
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Richard Polk Lawson
Gardner Brewer Hudson, P.A.
contact info
John Q. Kelly
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Alan Root
Represented By
Credence Elizabeth Sol
Armenta And Sol, PC
contact info
Matthew Lee Baldwin
Vargas Gonzalez Hevia Baldwin, LLP
contact info
Maria Cristina Armenta
Armenta & Sol, PC
contact info
Michael J. Jones
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Andrei Dan Popovici
Law Office Of Andrei D. Popovici, P.C.
contact info
Frank C. Dudenhefer
contact info
Sean M. Hamill
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
John P Coale
contact info
Marie L. Fiala
Marie L Fiala
contact info
Roland A. Paul
Ivey Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Ryan Tougias
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
John P. Coale
contact info
Richard Polk Lawson
Gardner Brewer Hudson, P.A.
contact info
John Q. Kelly
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Plaintiff
Naomi Wolf
Represented By
Credence Elizabeth Sol
Armenta And Sol, PC
contact info
Matthew Lee Baldwin
Vargas Gonzalez Hevia Baldwin, LLP
contact info
Maria Cristina Armenta
Armenta & Sol, PC
contact info
Michael J. Jones
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Andrei Dan Popovici
Law Office Of Andrei D. Popovici, P.C.
contact info
Sean M. Hamill
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
John P Coale
contact info
Marie L. Fiala
Marie L Fiala
contact info
Roland A. Paul
Ivey Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Ryan Tougias
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info
Frank C. Dudenhefer, Jr.
The Dudenhefer Law Firm L.L.C
contact info
Richard Polk Lawson
Gardner Brewer Hudson, P.A.
contact info
John Q. Kelly
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara
contact info

GPO May 06 2022
ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/6/2022. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2022)
GPO Jan 04 2023
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show cause response due by 1/23/2023. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/4/2023. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2023)
GPO Feb 14 2023
ORDER RE RULE 60(b) MOTION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/14/2023. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2023)

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
203 203 appeal USCA Order Tue 02/11 2:24 PM
ORDER of USCA as to169 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit,, filed by Wayne Alan Root, Dominick Latella, Naomi Wolf, Rafael Barbosa, Linda Cuadros, American Conservative Union, Donald J. Trump (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]