Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Eldon E Fallon
Referred: Michael North
Case #: 2:21-cv-01992
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2021
Re-opened:Jul 09, 2024
Terminated:Nov 27, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 26, 2022 3:32 AM CDT
Defendant
Bobbie Jones
Represented By
H. Michael Bush
Chaffe Mccall Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Sarah Voorhies Myers
Chaffe Mccall Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Amy L. McIntire
Chaffe Mccall Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Defendant
Ed Michel
Represented By
Walter Francis Becker, Jr.
Chaffe Mccall Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
H. Michael Bush
Chaffe Mccall Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Sarah Voorhies Myers
Chaffe Mccall Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Amy L. McIntire
Chaffe Mccall Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Defendant
New Orleans City
Represented By
Elizabeth S. Robins
Law Department, City Of New Orleans
contact info
Donesia D. Turner
City Of New Orleans
contact info
Eraka W. DeLarge
City Attorney'S Office (new Orleans)
contact info
Kevin C. Hill
New Orleans City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Jonathan Holden Adams
City Of New Orleans Law Department
contact info
Churita H. Hansell
City Attorney'S Office (new Orleans)
contact info
Defendant
Office of the Inspector General
Plaintiff
Kristen Morales
Represented By
Stephanie Dovalina
Stephanie Dovalina LLC
contact info

GPO Jun 23 2022
ORDER AND REASONS. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Michel and Joness Motion to Dismiss, R. Doc. 21, is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as further set forth in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant City of New Orleanss Motion to Dismiss, R. Doc. 22, is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motions to Dismiss regarding Plaintiffs first Complaint, R. Docs. 12 and 13, are DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all Defendants shall have until July 23, 2022 to file answers to Plaintiffs claims. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/23/2022. (lw)
GPO Mar 30 2023
ORDER AND REASONS granting 59 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/29/2023. (lag)
GPO Jun 15 2023
ORDER AND REASONS denying 82 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/14/2023. (lag)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, February 03, 2025
110 110 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Mon 02/03 3:27 PM
ORDER granting109 Motion to Dismiss Case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/3/2025. (gla)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
109 109 motion Dismiss Case Fri 01/31 11:23 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case by Office of the Inspector General.(McIntire, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order