Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC v. 777 Partners, LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Louis L Stanton |
Case #: | 1:21-mc-00797 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | M 08-85 Motion to Compel |
Case Filed: | Oct 29, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Florida Southern, 1:21-mc-23587 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, January 31, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Letter
Mon 01/31 4:47 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from John C. Gekas dated January 31, 2022 re: 777's Response to Innovatus' Letter re Motion to Compel. Document filed by 777 Partners LLC..(Gekas, John) |
|
Friday, January 28, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter
Fri 01/28 4:21 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Michael H. McGinley dated January 28, 2022 re: 777's Failure To Comply With The January 7, 2022 Court Order [Dkt.23]. Document filed by Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC..(McGinley, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, January 07, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 01/07 4:21 PM
ORDER: Innovatus's motion to compel documents responsive to its subpoena is granted, and 777 Partners' cross-motion to quash is denied, to the extent that the numbered Requests in the subpoena are modified and enforced as follows: Request No. 1. Stricken as overbroad and overburdensome. Reques t No. 2. Allowed with the words "any of Your/[or Their] affiliates" and "all communications related to any such agreements" stricken. Request No. 3. Allowed with the words "and/or any Affiliated business" stricken. Request No. 4. Same as No. 3. Request No. 5. Same as No. 3. Request No. 6. To be rewritten as "All information prepared by Your staff and given to Your board of managers relating to MV Realty's RTL Business. Request No. 7. Same as No. 1. Request No. 8. Same as No. 1Request No. 9. Same as No. 1. Request No. 10. To be rewritten as "All studies orappraisals of existing or potential markets for RTL transactions." (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 1/7/2022) (rro) |
|
Monday, November 29, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Mon 11/29 5:02 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:10 MOTION to Compel . . Document filed by 777 Partners LLC..(Gekas, John) |
|
Wednesday, November 24, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 11/24 5:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to File a sur-reply by end of day on November 29, 2021 . Document filed by 777 Partners LLC..(Gekas, John) |
|
Friday, November 19, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 11/19 8:27 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 MOTION to Compel . . Document filed by Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC, 777 Partners LLC. Motion or Order to File Under Seal:19 .(McGinley, Michael) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Seal
Fri 11/19 8:24 PM
LETTER MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Its Motion to Compel Documents Responsive to Subpoena to 777 Partners, LLC and in Opposition to 777 Partners, LLC's Cross-Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena ("Reply"), filed on November 19, 2021. addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Michael H. McGinley dated November 19, 2021. Document filed by Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC..(McGinley, Michael) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 11/19 8:13 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 MOTION to Compel . Redacted . Document filed by Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC..(McGinley, Michael) |
|
Thursday, November 18, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
order
Memo Endorsement
Thu 11/18 12:14 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:15 Letter filed by 777 Partners LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/17/2021) (rro) |
|
Wednesday, November 17, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Wed 11/17 9:43 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Michael H. McGinley dated November 17, 2021 re: Response to 777 Partners, LLC's November, 16, 2021 Letter Dkt.15 . Document filed by Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC..(McGinley, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, November 16, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter
Tue 11/16 5:17 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Lillian J. Lee dated November 16, 2021 re: Objection to Innovatus' Intent to Reply. Document filed by 777 Partners LLC..(Lee, Lillian) |
|
Monday, November 15, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Mon 11/15 8:19 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Michael H. McGinley dated November 15, 2021 re: Intent to File Reply. Document filed by Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC..(McGinley, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, November 09, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
16
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Tue 11/09 4:42 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:10 MOTION to Compel . . Document filed by 777 Partners LLC..(Gekas, John) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Declaration of Mollie Wander, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Declaration of Mollie Wander (Subpoena to 777), | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Declaration of Aaron Levy, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of John Gekas, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Declaration of John Gekas (Email correspondence with Innovatus counsel) | ||
Wednesday, November 03, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 11/03 1:14 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lillian Jihae Lee on behalf of 777 Partners LLC..(Lee, Lillian) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 11/03 10:29 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Constantine Gekas on behalf of 777 Partners LLC..(Gekas, John) |
|
Tuesday, November 02, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Compel
Tue 11/02 4:50 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION to Compel . Document filed by Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC, 777 Partners LLC.Motion or Order to File Under Seal:6 .(McGinley, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L | ||
Friday, October 29, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 10/29 8:51 AM
MISCELLANEOUS TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Florida Southern; Case Number: 1:21-mc-23587. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 10/29 8:59 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sjo) |
||
Wednesday, October 27, 2021 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER GRANTING NON-PARTY 777 PARTNERS, LLCS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER, granting7 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/29/2021.] | |
Tuesday, October 26, 2021 | ||
7 | 7 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer by 777 Partners, LLC. Attorney Hilda Piloto added to party 777 Partners, LLC(pty:dft).(Piloto, Hilda) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/29/2021.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 13, 2021 | ||
6 | 6 MOTION to Seal Motion to File Portion of its Motion to Compel as well as Certain Exhibits Attached Thereto under Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC. (Levy, Mark) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/29/2021.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE by Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions (Levy, Mark) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/29/2021.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE by Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC re1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, Notice of Filing Proposed Order to Motion to Compel Documents Responsive to Subpoena to 777 Partners, LLC (Levy, Mark) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/29/2021.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Steven B. Feirson, Michael H. McGinley, Stuart T. Steinberg, mailing date October 13, 2021, (pt) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/29/2021.] | |
Tuesday, October 12, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/29/2021.] | |
1 | 1 19 pgs Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Enforce from Another District . Filing fee $49.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15085997, filed by Innovatus Capital Partners, LLC.(Levy, Mark) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/29/2021.] | |
Att: 1 17 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet |