California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Neil W Bason
Case #: 2:21-bk-18333
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2021
Terminated:Nov 08, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Huntington Park Clinica Medica General Medical Center, Inc.
6347 Pacific Blvd
Huntington Park, CA 90255-4101
Represented By
Joel Rapaport
Rapaport Law Office
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, November 08, 2021
15 15 court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 11/08 4:19 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed - CASE TRANSFER OUT. The above referenced case has been transferred. An order was approved and entered. This case is therefore closed. Related [+] (Sumlin, Sharon E.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Huntington Park Clinica Medica General Medical Center, Inc.
Saturday, November 06, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 11/06 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (VAN-197) (BNC)
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 11/06 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order to Change Venue/Intra-district Transfer - Bankruptcy (No Motion) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, November 05, 2021
12 12 misc Comments Fri 11/05 2:22 PM
Comments CM/ECF Intradistrict Transfer feature used to transfer case from the Los Angeles Division to the San Fernando Valley Division(New Case Number Assigned: 1:21-bk-11821-VK, Previous Case Number: 2 21-18333 NB) (Campbell, Fern)
Related: [-]
11 11 trustee Notice Appointing Trustee Fri 11/05 1:50 PM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee Subchapter V; Proof of Service . John-Patrick McGinnis Fritz (TR) added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA). (Law, Dare)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2021
10 10 order Change venue/Intra-district Transfer - Bankruptcy (No Motion) (BNC-PDF) Thu 11/04 5:01 PM
Order reassigning bankruptcy case pursuant to general order 11-01 to Judge with prior related case/proceeding....Within District transfer to Judge Victoria S. Kaufman (BNC-PDF). Signed on 11/4/2021. (Sumlin, Sharon E.)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Change venue/Intra-district Transfer - Bankruptcy (No Motion) (BNC-PDF) Thu 11/04 3:47 PM
Order reassigning bankruptcy case pursuant to general order 11-01 to Judge with prior related case/proceeding....Within District transfer to Judge Victoria S. Kaufman (BNC-PDF). Signed on 11/4/2021. (Sumlin, Sharon E.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 11/03 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (VAN-197) (BNC)
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 11/03 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Huntington Park Clinica Medica General Medical Center, Inc.
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 11/03 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Huntington Park Clinica Medica General Medical Center, Inc.
5 5 misc List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Wed 11/03 9:17 PM
List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Filed by Debtor Huntington Park Clinica Medica General Medical Center, Inc.. (Rapaport, Joel)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (VAN-197) Wed 11/03 8:37 PM
Amended Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC) . Case remains deficient for: Master Mailing List of Creditors must be uploaded in CM/ECF in text (.txt) format in accordance with the Court Manual due 11/5/2021.2 . (Ly, Lynn)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Wed 11/03 7:56 PM
List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Filed by Debtor Huntington Park Clinica Medica General Medical Center, Inc.. (Rapaport, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
2 2 court Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (VAN-197) Mon 11/01 10:45 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC) . (Vandensteen, Nancy)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 10/29 6:59 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Huntington Park Clinica Medica General Medical Center, Inc. List of Equity Security Holders due 11/12/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 11/12/2021. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 11/12/2021. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 11/12/2021. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 11/12/2021. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 11/12/2021. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 11/12/2021. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 11/12/2021. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 11/12/2021. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 11/12/2021. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 11/12/2021. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 11/12/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 11/12/2021. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122B) Due: 11/12/2021. Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Form 121) due by 11/12/2021. Signature of Attorney on Petition (Form 101 or 201) due 11/12/2021. Schedule J-2: Expenses for Separate Household of Debtor 2 (Form 106J-2) due 11/12/2021. Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 11/12/2021. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 11/12/2021. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 11/12/2021. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 11/12/2021. Petition Preparer Notice, Declaration, and Signature - Form 119 due by 11/12/2021. Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Petition Preparer (Form 2800) due 11/12/2021. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 11/12/2021. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 11/12/2021. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 11/12/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 11/12/2021.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 11/29/2021 (Rapaport, Joel)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 10/29 7:00 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:21-bk-18333] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A53559072. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1