Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Geraghty
Case #: 1:21-cv-04474
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:216(b) Labor - Minimum wage or overtime compensation
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2021
Terminated:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 26, 2022 4:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Steak N Shake, Inc.
Represented By
Deepa N. Subramanian
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Atl
contact info
Darin Phillip Shreves
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Patrick F. Hulla
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Mo
contact info
Interested Party
Hodges & Foty, LLP
Interested Party
Jackson, Shields, Yeiser, Holt, Owen & Bryant
Interested Party
Ogletree Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
Interested Party
Parks, Chesin & Walbert, P.C.
Interested Party
The Lazzaro Law Firm
Plaintiff
Walter Brown
Represented By
Benjamin Alan Matthews
Jackson Shields Yeiser
contact info
John Lawrence Mays
Parks Chesin & Walbert, P.C. -Atl
contact info
Allan Leroy Parks, Jr.
Parks Chesin & Walbert, P.C. -Atl
contact info
Robert E. Morelli, III
Jackson, Shields, Yesier, Holt, Owen & Bryant
contact info
A. Lee Parks, Jr
Parks Chesin & Walbert, P.C. -Atl
contact info
Joseph Russ Bryant
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant
contact info
Anthony J. Lazzaro
Leboeuf Lamb Greene & Macrae
contact info
Alanna Klein Fischer
The Lazzaro Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Don J. Foty
Hodges & Foty, LLP
contact info
Lori M. Griffin
The Lazzaro Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
107 107 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/06 3:20 PM
ORDER GRANTING106 Motion for Referral to Magistrate Judge for Mediation. This case is REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard for the assignment of a Magistrate Judge for mediation and is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED while the parties engage in the mediation process. The parties are DIRECTED to file a joint status report within 5 days of the completion of mediation to inform the Court of its outcome. If mediation is unsuccessful, the parties shall file along with their joint report a proposed, amended case management schedule, or their respective versions of the same. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 5/6/2025. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 05/06 3:21 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Settlement Judge Tue 05/06 3:21 PM
CASE REFERRED to Settlement Judge Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 05/06 3:22 PM
Submission of107 Order to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (ane)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
106 106 misc Status Report Fri 05/02 3:34 PM
STATUS REPORT and Request for Referral to Magistrate Judge for Mediation by Walter Brown. (Foty, Don)
Related: [-]