Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:21-cr-00938
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Oct 30, 2021 2:44 AM CDT
Defendant
Matthew Ethan Joseph Castillo (1)
Represented By
Elizabeth Ann O'Connell
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Corpus Christi
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
John George Edward Marck
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/30/2021 3:13 AM CDT
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
Arrest of Matthew Ethan Joseph Castillo. (AnnSalazaradi, 2) [2:21-mj-01224]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Matthew Ethan Joseph Castillo (1), filed. (Brooks) Initial Appearance set for 10/4/2021 at 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton (AnnSalazaradi, 2) [2:21-mj-01224]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Matthew Ethan Joseph Castillo, (Deft informed of rights) held on 10/4/2021. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Court grants request for appointment of counsel. Defendant consents to this hearing by video conference. Government moves for detention and requests a continuance. Court grants Government's request for continuance. Financial Affidavited administered in open Court. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 10/7/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton. Appearances: Reid Manning, AUSA. (Digital # 9:37-9:46) (ERO: Brittany Painschab) (Interpreter: not used) Deft remanded to custody. (AnnSalazaradi, 2) [2:21-mj-01224]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Elizabeth Ann O'Connell, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Matthew Ethan Joseph Castillo, filed.(O'Connell, Elizabeth) [2:21-mj-01224]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. John George Edward Marck appearing for USA, filed.(Marck, John) [2:21-mj-01224]
Related: [-]
2 2 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Matthew Ethan Joseph Castillo. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton) Parties notified. (AnnSalazaradi, 2) [2:21-mj-01224]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton) Parties notified. (MichelleHollidayadi, 2) [2:21-mj-01224]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton: PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION & DETENTION HEARING as to Matthew Ethan Joseph Castillo held on 10/7/2021 Defendant consents to this hearing by video conference. Defendant waives preliminary hearing and detention hearing without prejudice in open court. Appearances: Yifei Zheng, AUSA; Rachel Braver for Elizabeth O'Connell f/Defendant; USM: Deputy Marrero. (Digital # 9:11-9:12) (ERO: Amanda Alegria) (Interpreter: not used) Deft remanded to custody. (AnnSalazaradi, 2) [2:21-mj-01224]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Matthew Ethan Joseph Castillo ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) Parties notified. (AnnSalazaradi, 2) [2:21-mj-01224]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
5 5 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Matthew Ethan Joseph Castillo, filed. (ErinLandrum, 2) [2:21-mj-01224]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
6 6 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Matthew Ethan Joseph Castillo (1) count(s) 1, filed. (GenayRoganadi, 2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
7 7 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Matthew Ethan Joseph Castillo, filed.(GenayRoganadi, 2)
Related: [-]
8 8 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Matthew Ethan Joseph Castillo. Motions to Continue the Final Pretrial Conference and Jury Trial, Motions in Limine, Exhibit and Witness Lists, and Proposed Jury Instructions due no later than three (3) days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Arraignment set for 11/9/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Jury Trial set for 12/13/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (GenayRoganadi, 2)
Related: [-]