Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Darrell A Clay
Case #: 3:21-cv-02061
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2021
Terminated:Nov 21, 2022
Last checked: Friday Apr 29, 2022 4:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC
Represented By
Gary S. Fealk
Vercruysse Murray & Calzone
contact info
Melissa M. Tetreau
Bodman - Troy
contact info
Plaintiff
Cheryl Weller
Represented By
Edward J. Stechschulte
Kalniz, Iorio & Reardon
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, November 21, 2022
17 17 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 11/21 3:29 PM
Order of Case Dismissal. The Court reserves jurisdiction to enforce/interpret the parties' settlement agreement. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 11/21/2022. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
16 16 oth_doc Proposed Order Mon 11/21 11:21 AM
Proposed Order of Dismissal (Stipulated) filed by Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC. (Fealk, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 11/10 1:55 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. Settlement Conference 11/10/2022. Plaintiff Cheryl Weller appeared and was represented by her attorney Edward Stechschulte. Defendant Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC appeared through its authorized representatives Mark Paull and Dylan Loga and was represented by its attorney Gary Fealk. Additional extensive discussions were had with the parties and all counsel, which led to agreement on the material terms of a resolution. I convened a conference with all parties and counsel, at which time the material terms were recited and agreed to by all. Those material terms are to be further confirmed in an e-mail exchange between counsel, with a copy also sent to Clay_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov. Further, all parties have consented to my jurisdiction for the balance of this proceeding. The parties are to submit a joint entry dismissing this matter with prejudice within 30 days. The Court reserves jurisdiction to interpret and enforce the terms of the settlement agreement. Time: 2 hours 53 minutes. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
order Consent to Magistrate Judge Thu 11/10 1:59 PM
Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay for further proceedings. Judge James R. Knepp II on 11/10/2022. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Thu 11/10 2:04 PM
Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay assigned to case pursuant to consent. Judge James R. Knepp II terminated. (H,JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
15 15 notice Status Report (atty event) Wed 09/21 12:01 PM
Joint Status Report and Request to Modify Schedule filed by Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC. Related document(s)14 .(Fealk, Gary)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to extend deadlines Wed 09/21 2:44 PM
Order [non-document] granting the Joint15 Request to Modify Schedule. Discovery now due by 12/19/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 2/3/2023. Judge James R. Knepp II on 9/21/2022. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 09/20 3:11 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. Settlement Conference held 9/20/2022. Plaintiff Cheryl Weller appeared and was represented by her attorney Edward Stechschulte. Defendant Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC appeared through its authorized representatives Mark Paull and Dylan Loga and was represented by its attorney Gary Fealk. Extensive discussions were had with the parties and all counsel, and progress was made toward a potential resolution of this matter. With the consent of all parties and counsel, the Settlement Conference will resume at 10:00 a.m. on Thursday, November 10, 2022 by video conference. Instructions for accessing the video conference will be provided in advance. Any party wishing to submit an updated settlement position statement may do so by Monday, November 7, 2022 at 5:00 p.m. Counsel were directed to contact Judge Knepp's chambers in order to provide an update regarding case management considerations. Time: 2 hours 45 minutes. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
14 14 motion Extension (of deadlines) Fri 09/16 9:46 AM
Joint Motion for extension of Discovery Cut Off until November 15, 2022 filed by Plaintiff Cheryl Weller. (Stechschulte, Edward)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
13 13 motion Continue Mon 08/01 3:29 PM
Joint Motion to continue Settlement Conference filed by Plaintiff Cheryl Weller. (Stechschulte, Edward)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to continue Mon 08/01 4:17 PM
Order [non-document] granting Joint13 Motion to continue. Settlement Conference set for 9/20/2022 at 11:00 AM in Chambers 403 (Toledo) before Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. Ex parte settlement statements shall be submitted by email to Clay_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 9/13/2022. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 8/1/2022.(R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
12 12 motion Extension (other) Tue 05/31 2:43 PM
Joint Motion for extension of time until June 9, 2022 to August, 2022 filed by Defendant Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC. Related document(s)9 . (Fealk, Gary)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time (other) Tue 05/31 3:02 PM
Order [non-document] granting Joint12 Motion for extension of time until June 9, 2022 to August, 2022. Settlement Conference RESET for 8/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 403 (Toledo) before Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. Ex parte settlement statements shall be submitted by email to Clay_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 8/3/2022. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 5/31/2022.(R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
11 11 order Protective Order Mon 04/04 1:38 PM
Protective Order regarding confidential documents. Judge James R. Knepp II on 4/4/2022. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
10 10 oth_doc Proposed Order Fri 04/01 1:15 PM
Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order filed by Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC. (Tetreau, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
9 9 5 pgs order Order Wed 01/26 1:53 PM
Order . Settlement Conference set for 6/9/2022 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 403 before Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. Ex parte settlement statements shall be submitted by email to Clay_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 6/2/2022. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 1/26/2022. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
8 8 order Case Management Conference Plan/Order Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Fri 01/21 11:56 AM
Case Management Conference Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties shall exchange Rule 26(a) disclosures by 2/21/2022. Discovery cut-off dates: Plaintiff's expert disclosures by 7/15/2022; Defendant's expert disclosures by 8/15/2022; Liability & Damages by 9/16/2022. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 3/7/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 10/14/2022. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay for a settlement conference to be held in June 2022. Judge James R. Knepp II on 1/21/2022. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
minutes Case Management Conference Fri 01/21 8:32 AM
Minutes of Case Management Conference [non-document] held via telephone on 1/20/2022 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Plaintiff appeared by attorney Edward J. Stechschulte; Defendant appeared by attorneys Gary S. Fealk and Melissa M. Tetreau. Case to be referred for settlement conference in June 2022. Case Management Conference Order to follow. Time: 15 minutes. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 17, 2022
7 7 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Mon 01/17 10:17 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Cheryl Weller. (Stechschulte, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
6 6 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Wed 12/08 8:39 AM
Attorney Appearance by Melissa M. Tetreau filed by on behalf of Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC. (Tetreau, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
5 5 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Tue 12/07 2:15 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order: Case Management Conference to be held via telephone on 1/20/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge James R. Knepp II. The conference will convene on the Court's bridge line with dial-in access information to be provided to counsel in advance of the call. Judge James R. Knepp II on 12/7/2021. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting
Monday, December 06, 2021
4 4 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Mon 12/06 4:47 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent KUKA U.S. Holdings Company LLC for Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC filed by Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC. (Fealk, Gary)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/06 4:34 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, filed by Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC. (Fealk, Gary)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Mon 11/01 10:07 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Kuka Toledo Production Operations, LLC. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 11/01 9:50 AM
Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 11/01 9:51 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice re Prompt Service Mon 11/01 10:08 AM
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (K,AR)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 31, 2021
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Sun 10/31 8:59 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Cheryl Weller. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11110453.. Filed by Cheryl Weller. (Stechschulte, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit EEOC Right to Sue Letter,
Att: 3 Summons Summons