UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BERTELSMANN SE & CO. KGAA et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Florence Y Pan |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-02886 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Nov 02, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 02, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday May 01, 2022 5:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
BERTELSMANN SE & CO. KGAA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PENGUIN RANDOM HOUSE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SIMON & SCHUSTER, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
VIACOMCBS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 09, 2023 | ||
226 | 226
misc
Redacted Transcript
Thu 02/09 11:12 AM
REDACTED TRANSCRIPT re: Transcript215 before Circuit Judge Florence Y Pan of proceedings held on August 16, 2022, Page Numbers: 2469 - 2614. Date of Issuance: February 9, 2023. Court Reporter: Jeff Hook. Telephone number: 202-354-3373. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] Other transcript formats are also available (multi-page, condensed,CD or ASCII)(Hook, Jeff) |