Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:21-cv-01842
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2021
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:21-cv-02345
Last checked: Sunday May 01, 2022 4:55 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
Phillip Rozsi
Represented By
DANIEL JAMES THORNBURGH
Aylstock Witkin Kreis & Overholtz - Pensacola Fl
contact info
BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK
Aylstock Witkin Kreis & Overholtz - Pensacola Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
20 20 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 10/12 12:06 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/20/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
19 19 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 09/29 2:11 PM
ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint by 3M COMPANY. (SUTHERLAND, KARI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/29 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES F MORROW on behalf of All Defendants (MORROW, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/07 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK A DREHER on behalf of All Defendants (DREHER, MARK)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 05, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 06/05 8:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by DEBRA RENEE SHERRER BAGGETT on behalf of Phillip Rozsi (BAGGETT, DEBRA)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 04, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 06/04 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BOBBY J BRADFORD on behalf of Phillip Rozsi (BRADFORD, BOBBY)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 06/04 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MAURY SAMUEL GOLDSTEIN on behalf of Phillip Rozsi (GOLDSTEIN, MAURY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/24 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KARI L SUTHERLAND on behalf of All Defendants (SUTHERLAND, KARI)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/24 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M ROBINSON on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (ROBINSON, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/04 9:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK on behalf of Phillip Rozsi (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/04 9:11 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT per PTO 17 against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by Phillip Rozsi. (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
9 9 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 11/02 3:52 PM
ORDER - PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 11/22/2021 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 11/02 3:44 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-02345. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Tue 11/02 2:55 PM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-125) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(lmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
6 6 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2885 re:1 Notice of Removal,. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/2/2021.]
Related: [-]
5 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Bryan F. Aylstock, Jennifer M. Hoekstra, Douglass A. Kreis, Neil D. Overholtz as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/2/2021.]
Related: [-]
4 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-2345 JRT/KMM. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/2/2021.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/2/2021.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/2/2021.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9096108) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/2/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet