CHRISTMAN v. 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-01877 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday May 02, 2022 4:20 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JONATHAN WILLIAM CHRISTMAN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/03 10:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK on behalf of JONATHAN WILLIAM CHRISTMAN (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN) |
|
Friday, April 08, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Fri 04/08 10:46 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel and Request for Removal from Service List by JONATHAN WILLIAM CHRISTMAN (RIVERS, KRISTAN) |
|
Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/30 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT SCOTT CONNALLY on behalf of JONATHAN WILLIAM CHRISTMAN (CONNALLY, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice | ||
Friday, February 04, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 02/04 11:07 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO FILER Please do not file transitions in direct filed civil case. Re5 Refiled Short Form Complaint - MDL cases only filed by JONATHAN WILLIAM CHRISTMAN, 3 Notice of Transition filed by JONATHAN WILLIAM CHRISTMAN,4 Notice (Other) filed by JONATHAN WILLIAM CHRISTMAN (djb) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Refiled Short Form Complaint - MDL cases only
Fri 02/04 10:30 AM
REFILED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JONATHAN WILLIAM CHRISTMAN. (RIVERS, KRISTAN) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Fri 02/04 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - Middle District of Florida by JONATHAN WILLIAM CHRISTMAN (RIVERS, KRISTAN) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Transition
Fri 02/04 9:20 AM
NOTICE OF TRANSITION by JONATHAN WILLIAM CHRISTMAN (RIVERS, KRISTAN) |
|
Thursday, November 04, 2021 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 11/04 8:23 AM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY and JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II no longer assigned to case. (djb) |
||
Wednesday, November 03, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 11/03 3:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (RIVERS, KRISTAN) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/03 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6527724.), filed by JONATHAN WILLIAM CHRISTMAN. (RIVERS, KRISTAN) |