New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vernon S Broderick
Case #: 1:21-cv-09096
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2021
Terminated:Aug 12, 2022
Last checked: Monday May 02, 2022 5:09 AM EDT
Defendant
TD Associates, LLC
Represented By
Hannah L Wurgaft
Brann & Isaacson
contact info
Peter J Brann
Brann & Isaacson
contact info
Fredric Paul Gallin
Methfessel & Werbel, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Yensy Contreras
Represented By
Jarrett Scott Charo
Mizrahi Kroub LLP
contact info
William Downes
Mizrahi Kroub LLP
contact info
Edward Y. Kroub
Mizrahi Kroub LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, March 06, 2025
57 57 19 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 03/06 10:56 AM
OPINION & ORDER re:33 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Sanctions . filed by TD Associates, LLC. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion for attorney's fees and sanctions is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at Docket Entry 33. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/6/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]