Jasmine Williams et al v. City of Beverly Hills
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-08698 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles County Superior Court, Central, 21STCV31949 |
Last checked: Monday May 02, 2022 1:20 AM PDT |
Defendant
Captain Scott Dowling
|
|
Defendant
Officer Jerry Whittaker
|
|
Defendant
Sandra Spagnoli
|
|
Defendant
Dominick Rivetti
|
|
Defendant
City of Beverly Hills
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Officer Jonathan De La Cruz
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Sergeant Dale Drummond
|
|
Defendant
Officer Jon Ilusorio
|
|
Defendant
Officer Billy Blair
|
|
Defendant
Sgt Billy Fair
|
|
Defendant
Officer James Krug
|
|
Defendant
Officer Jesse Lyga
|
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Nett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lakisha Swift
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juwan White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Williams Jasmine
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Khalil White
Terminated: 04/21/2022
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
240 | 240
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/04 10:46 AM
ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION239 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The discovery deadline is continued to 7/29/2024. The joint motion for class certification is continued to 8/30/2024. (vdr) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
239 | 239
stip
Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date
Fri 03/01 5:11 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 07/29/2024 filed by Defendants Billy Blair, City of Beverly Hills, Jonathan De La Cruz(individual), Jonathan De La Cruz(official capacities as employees of the City of Beverly Hills), Scott Dowling(individual), Scott Dowling(official capacities as employees of the City of Beverly Hills), Dale Drummond(individual), Dale Drummond(official capacities as employees of the City of Beverly Hills), Billy Fair, Jon Ilusorio(individual), Jon Ilusorio(official capacities as employees of the City of Beverly Hills), James Krug, Jesse Lyga, Dominick Rivetti, Sandra Spagnoli, Jerry Whittaker.(Sullivan, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |