Florida Middle District Court
Judge:James S Moody, Jr
Referred: Sean P Flynn
Case #: 8:21-cv-02595
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1693 Electronic Fund Transfer Act (EFTA)
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2021
Terminated:Dec 03, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday May 03, 2022 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Kristy Bickmeyer
Represented By
Nicolas Ben Harvey
Withers Harvey, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Twinkle Toes Nanny Agency Tampa, LLC
Represented By
Nicolas Ben Harvey
Withers Harvey, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Stefani Colossi
Represented By
Thomas Martin Bonan
Seraph Legal P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, December 06, 2021
utility Acknowledgment - Transferred Case Opened Mon 12/06 8:55 AM
Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the Northern District of Florida as case 1:21-cv-00198, filed 12/03/2021.(JNB)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 03, 2021
9 9 transfer District transfer out Fri 12/03 2:27 PM
TRANSFER to the District of Northern District of Florida, Gainesville Division. (JNB)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Fri 12/03 10:40 AM
ORDER: The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Gainesville Division of the Northern District of Florida. The Clerk is then directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 12/3/2021. (SMB)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 12/03 10:17 AM
NOTICE to counsel Nicolas Ben Harvey of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JLD)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 12/03 9:33 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants.(Harvey, Nicolas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Terms & Agreement
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 11/10 12:37 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
4 4 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/05 9:58 AM
NOTICE by Stefani Colossi re1 Complaint filing amended civil cover sheet(Bonan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Supplement Amended Civil Cover Sheet
3 3 service Summons issued Fri 11/05 9:11 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Kristy Bickmeyer and Twinkle Toes Nanny Agency Tampa, LLC. (JLD)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 11/05 8:06 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:21-cv-2595-JSM-SPF. (SJB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/04 7:26 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18896028) filed by Stefani Colossi.(Bonan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover sheet signed,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Summons Twinkle Toes,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Summons Kristy,
Att: 4 Exhibit All Exhibits