Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-11820

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Wiles
Case #: 1:21-ap-01199
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2021
Terminated:Jul 08, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Guillo Pool Services, Inc.
Represented By
Guillo Pool Services, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Jackie Guillo
Represented By
Jackie Guillo
contact info
Defendant
Jeremy Bruce Reifer
Represented By
Jeremy Bruce Reifer
contact info
Plaintiff
Salvatore LaMonica, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Stanley Jules Reifer
LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP 3305 Jerusalem Avenue
Wantagh, NY 11793
Represented By
Joseph S. Maniscalco
Lamonica Herbst & Maniscalco
contact info
Nina Proctor
Lamonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, July 08, 2022
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 07/08 10:06 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1199 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
16 16 order Motion, Approve Compromise Wed 06/22 1:10 PM
Order signed on 6/22/2022 approving the chapter 7 trustee's motion authorizing and approving the stipulation of settlement between the chapter 7 trustee and defendants Guillo Pool Services, Inc. and Jackie Guillo Related [+]. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 14
Thursday, May 19, 2022
15 15 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 05/19 2:29 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Joseph S. Maniscalco on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Stanley Jules Reifer. (Maniscalco, Joseph)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
14 14 motion Motion, Approve Compromise Wed 05/18 9:00 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise Chapter 7 Trustees Motion For The Entry Of An Order, Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §105(a) And Rule 9019(a) Of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure, Authorizing And Approving The Stipulation Of Settlement By And Between The Chapter 7 Trustee And Defendants Guillo Pool Services, Inc. And Jackie Guillo filed by Nina Marie Proctor on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Stanley Jules Reifer with hearing to be held on 6/14/2022 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MEW) Responses due by 6/7/2022,. (Proctor, Nina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Fully Executed Stipulation of Settlement
Monday, February 28, 2022
13 13 order So Ordered Stipulation Mon 02/28 8:44 AM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 2/28/2022 as to defendant Jeremy Bruce Reifer Related [+]. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, February 25, 2022
12 12 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Fri 02/25 4:47 PM
Notice of Proposed Order / Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Jeremy Bruce Reifer filed by Nina Marie Proctor on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Stanley Jules Reifer. (Proctor, Nina)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Mon 02/07 6:25 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Paris Gyparakis on behalf of Jeremy Bruce Reifer. (Gyparakis, Paris)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, February 03, 2022
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 02/03 6:09 PM
Certificate of Service of Answer & Affirmative Defenses Related [+] Filed by Paris Gyparakis on behalf of Jeremy Bruce Reifer. (Gyparakis, Paris)
Related: [-] 8
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/03 1:58 PM
Stipulated Pretrial Scheduling Order signed on 2/3/2022. Final pre-trial conference to be held on 8/3/2022 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (MEW). (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
8 8 answer None Wed 01/19 10:08 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Paris Gyparakis on behalf of Jeremy Bruce Reifer. (Gyparakis, Paris)
Related: [-] 1 1
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
7 7 answer None Wed 01/05 4:28 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Cooper Macco on behalf of Jackie Guillo, Guillo Pool Services, Inc..(Macco, Cooper)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
6 6 order So Ordered Stipulation Wed 12/22 1:55 PM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 12/22/2021 extending time for defendant Jeremy Bruce Reifer to answer to the complaint trough and including January 15, 2022 Related [+]. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 misc Stipulation Wed 12/22 10:43 AM
Stipulation /Proposed Stipulation and Order Extending the Time for the Defendant Jeremy Bruce Reifer to Answer the Complaint Filed by Nina Marie Proctor on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Stanley Jules Reifer. (Proctor, Nina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
4 4 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 11/18 3:35 PM
Affidavit of Service (service by Secretary of State) Related [+] Filed by Joseph S. Maniscalco on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Stanley Jules Reifer. (Maniscalco, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Thursday, November 11, 2021
3 3 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 11/11 1:06 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Joseph S. Maniscalco on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Stanley Jules Reifer. (Maniscalco, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Thursday, November 04, 2021
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Thu 11/04 4:22 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/19/2022 at 10:30 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (MEW), Answer due by 12/6/2021, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 11/04 2:06 PM
Adversary case 21-01199 Complaint against Guillo Pool Services, Inc., Jackie Guillo, Jeremy Bruce Reifer (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by Nina Proctor, Joseph S. Maniscalco on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Stanley Jules Reifer. (Maniscalco, Joseph)
Related: [-]