Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Jill E Mccook
Referred: H Bruce Guyton
Case #: 3:21-cv-00377
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2021
Terminated:Feb 03, 2023
Case in other court:Knox County Circuit Court, 2-240-21
Last checked: Wednesday May 04, 2022 4:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Kone, Inc.
Represented By
Joshua A Wolfe
Mcangus, Goudelock & Courie, Llc (knoxville)
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie E Spangler
Represented By
John P Dreiser
Law Offices Of Tony Farmer & John Dreiser
contact info
Jeffrey C Taylor
Taylor Law Firm (morristown)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Keith Spangler
Terminated: 02/08/2022
Represented By
John P Dreiser
Law Offices Of Tony Farmer & John Dreiser
contact info
Jeffrey C Taylor
Taylor Law Firm (morristown)
contact info


Docket last updated: 80 minutes ago
Friday, February 03, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 02/03 1:18 PM
ORDER: Given that there is no objection to the Notice, the Court DISMISSES this case WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to CLOSE this matter.Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 2/3/23. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 02/02 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Stephanie E Spangler(Taylor, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Proposed Order
Thursday, December 29, 2022
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 12/29 2:55 PM
AGREED ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 12/29/22. (JBR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
18 18 motion Amend/Revise Wed 12/28 9:56 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Revise15 Scheduling Order by Kone, Inc..(Wolfe, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Proposed Order
Monday, February 07, 2022
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 02/07 9:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Party of Claim by Plaintiff Keith Spangler by Kone, Inc.. (Wolfe, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 31, 2022
16 16 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 01/31 4:46 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE per SO 22-02. Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to US Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/31/2022. (KMK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
15 15 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/27 2:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/2/2023 09:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2023 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 1/27/22. (JBR)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
14 14 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/24 4:20 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/24/2022. Jury Trial set for 5/2/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton. Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2023 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton.(Court Reporter ECRO) (MGD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 01/12 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Hearing:Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2022 03:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton. Conference Info: 877-336-1280;Access Code 8173506(MGD)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
13 13 order Consent to Magistrate and Order of Reference Mon 01/10 1:48 PM
ORDER. Pursuant to the parties Notice of Consent 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that this case be REFERRED to the Honorable H. Bruce Guyton, United States Magistrate Judge, for all further proceedings and the entry of final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Signed by District Judge Thomas A. Varlan on 1/10/22. (ADA)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/10 10:36 AM
NOTICE by Kone, Inc. of Service of Discovery (Wolfe, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
11 11 notice Notice of Consent/Nonconsent Fri 01/07 1:01 PM
NOTICE OF CONSENT to Magistrate by Kone, Inc. (Wolfe, Joshua)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Deficiency (PDF) Fri 01/07 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency (PDF) re9 Notice of Consent/Nonconsent. Please refile and be sure to flatten the pdf per attached notice. Document is incomplete. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 06, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Consent/Nonconsent Thu 01/06 8:53 PM
NOTICE OF CONSENT by Kone, Inc. (Wolfe, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
8 8 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 12/28 2:56 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wolfe, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
7 7 1 pgs order Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge Wed 11/10 11:36 AM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/10/21. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/10 11:18 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Kone, Inc..(Wolfe, Joshua)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate of Corporate Interest Wed 11/10 11:18 AM
Certificate of Corporate Interest by Kone, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kone Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Finescal Oy, Corporate Parent Kone Corporation for Kone, Inc.. (Wolfe, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
4 4 3 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Fri 11/05 3:44 PM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/05/2021. (AMP)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Fri 11/05 3:44 PM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/05/2021. (AMP)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Fri 11/05 3:43 PM
Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/05/2021. (AMP)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 11/05 1:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Circuit Court, case number 2-240-21. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4892097), filed by Kone, Inc..(Wolfe, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Other Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 11/05 3:40 PM
District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AMP)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Failure to File CCI Fri 11/05 3:43 PM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Kone, Inc. (AMP)
Related: [-]