Connecticut District Court
Judge:Victor A Bolden
Case #: 3:21-cv-01486
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2021
Terminated:Oct 23, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday May 04, 2022 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Bozzuto's, Inc.
Represented By
Sheldon D. Myers
Kainen, Escalera & Mchale, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Truax William Glass
Represented By
Rebecca Malinguaggio
Michael E. Satti Attorney At Law LLC
contact info
Michael E. Satti
Michael E. Satti
contact info

GPO May 12 2023
ourt declines to retain supplemental jurisdiction over his state law claim. Mr. Glass's motion to hold the summary judgment motion in abeyance and to reopen discovery is DENIED.The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to enter judgORDER granting 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 50 Motion for Order. For the reasons set forth in the attached Ruling and Order, Defendant's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED as to Mr. Glass's federal claim, and the Cment accordingly and close this case.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/12/2023. (Sullivan, John)

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, October 23, 2023
56 56 misc Docket Annotation Mon 10/23 3:25 PM
Docket Entry Correction re55 Judgment, Corrected Judgment added as a replacement PDF. (Murphy, Tatihana)
Related: [-]
55 55 order Judgment Mon 10/23 3:20 PM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Bozzuto's, Inc. against Truax William Glass. For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2023.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Murphy, Tatihana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/23/2023) Replacement PDF-MAIN
54 54 order Judgment Mon 10/23 12:08 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR- JUDGMENT entered in favor of Truax William Glass against Bozzuto's, Inc.. For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2023.(Murphy, Tatihana) Modified on 10/23/2023 (Murphy, Tatihana)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Mon 10/23 12:09 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Murphy, Tatihana)
Related: [-]