Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Joan A Lenard
Referred: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Case #: 1:21-cv-23911
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2021
Terminated:Mar 07, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday May 04, 2022 5:07 AM EDT
Defendant
ZOOLOGICAL WILDLIFE FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By
Diana Fitzgerald
Fitzgerald & Isaacson, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
EARNEST MARTEL SHERMAN
Represented By
Genna Leigh Sinel
Jones Day
contact info
David M. Marco
Smithmarco, P.C.
contact info
Charlotte Ann Long
Trans Union, LLC
contact info
Charles James McHale, Jr.
Golden Scaz Gagain, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 07, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Mon 03/07 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by EARNEST MARTEL SHERMAN (Marco, David)
Related: [-]
order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 03/07 1:39 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER CLOSING CASE. On March 7, 2022, Plaintiff filed a15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, dismissing the case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Because "a notice of dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) is 'effective immediately upon filing,'" Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC , 677 F.3d 1272, 1277 (11th Cir. 2012) (quoting Matthews v. Gaither , 902 F.2d 877, 880 (11th Cir. 1990) (per curiam)), this case is CLOSED, effective March 7, 2022, the date Plaintiff filed the15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This entry constitutes the PAPERLESS ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 3/7/2022. (gie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
14 14 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 02/23 3:50 PM
Order Setting Forth the Court's Policy on Motions for Extension or Stay of the Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 02/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (dp)
Related: [-]
13 13 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Wed 02/23 3:49 PM
ORDER of Referral to Initial Mediation and Directing Plaintiff's Counsel to Submit (Within Fourteen Days) Proposed Order Scheduling Initial Mediation. Mediation Deadline 04/25/2022. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 02/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (dp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix
12 12 7 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 02/23 3:47 PM
Order Referring Discovery Disputes and Certain Pretrial Motions to Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis; Directing Parties to File Certificates of Interested Parties; Directing Parties to File a Notice of Refiling And/or of Related Cases; Requiring Completion of Form Consenting to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge; and Requiring Completion of Joint Scheduling Report and Form. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 2/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (dp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix,
Att: 2 Appendix
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
11 11 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/22 6:47 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by ZOOLOGICAL WILDLIFE FOUNDATION, INC. (Fitzgerald, Diana)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 02/22 6:43 PM
Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ZOOLOGICAL WILDLIFE FOUNDATION, INC.. Responses due by 3/8/2022 (Fitzgerald, Diana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 02/03 8:42 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have until and including February 22, 2022 to respond to the Complaint. This entry constitutes the PAPERLESS ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 2/3/2022. (gie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
8 8 motion Extension of Time Wed 02/02 5:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint re1 Complaint by ZOOLOGICAL WILDLIFE FOUNDATION, INC.. Attorney Diana Fitzgerald added to party ZOOLOGICAL WILDLIFE FOUNDATION, INC.(pty:dft). Responses due by 2/16/2022(Fitzgerald, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
order Order to Show Cause Tue 02/01 8:40 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On January 4, 2022, Plaintiff filed a Waiver of Service6 indicating that Defendant agreed to waive service of a summons in this action on December 2, 2021. Pursuant to Rule 4(d)(3), Defendant had sixty (60) days after the request for waiver was sent to file an answer. Over sixty days have now passed, and Defendant has not filed an answer. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff has until February 11, 2022 to file a Motion for Default or show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. This entry constitutes the PAPERLESS ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 2/1/2022. (gie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 01/04 3:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EARNEST MARTEL SHERMAN. ZOOLOGICAL WILDLIFE FOUNDATION, INC. waiver sent on 12/2/2021, response/answer due 1/31/2022. (Marco, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/08 10:54 AM
NOTICE by EARNEST MARTEL SHERMAN re1 Complaint Notice of Withdraw of Attorney ECF Notice (Marco, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/08 10:50 AM
NOTICE by EARNEST MARTEL SHERMAN re1 Complaint of Corrected Filing to Correct Signature Page (Marco, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Correct Signature Page
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 11/08 7:55 AM
Summons Issued as to ZOOLOGICAL WILDLIFE FOUNDATION, INC. (pes)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/05 4:47 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ZOOLOGICAL WILDLIFE FOUNDATION, INC.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15153802, filed by EARNEST MARTEL SHERMAN.(Marco, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 11/08 7:52 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
Related: [-]