Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Christopher C Conner
Case #: 1:21-cv-01889
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2021
Terminated:Apr 26, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday May 04, 2022 5:12 AM EDT
Defendant
USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By
Brigid Q. Alford
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Christopher W Woodward
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Plaintiff
Melanie Miller
Represented By
Corey S. Suda
Fellerman & Ciarimboli Law, P.C.
contact info

GPO Apr 26 2023
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 4/26/2023. (mw)

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
42 42 appeal USCA Mandate (Terminates Appeal) Wed 01/29 10:51 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to39 Notice of Appeal, filed by Melanie Miller(King, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Clerk's Letter to District Court,
Att: 2 Opinion
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
41 41 appeal USCA Judgment (Use this if Mandate Will Follow) Tue 01/07 2:16 PM
JUDGMENT of USCA as to39 Notice of Appeal, filed by Melanie Miller (King, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
39 39 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 05/22 11:04 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL in NON-PRISONER Case as to36 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,35 Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry),37 Judgment by Melanie Miller. Filing Fee and Docket Fee PAID. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number APAMDC-6292081. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Senoff, David)
Related: [-]
38 38 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Mon 05/22 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Senoff on behalf of Melanie Miller (Senoff, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
37 37 order Judgment Wed 04/26 9:28 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of USAA General Indemnity Company and against Melanie Miller. Signed by the Deputy Clerk on 4/26/2023. (mw)
Related: [-]
36 36 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 04/26 9:24 AM
ORDER (Memorandum filed as previous docket entry) - it is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Doc. 30) for summary judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant USAA and against plaintiff Melanie Miller. The Clerk of Court is further directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 4/26/2023 (mw)
Related: [-]
35 35 7 pgs order Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Wed 04/26 9:18 AM
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 4/26/2023. (mw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
34 34 respm Reply Brief Tue 01/03 3:09 PM
REPLY BRIEF re30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Alford, Brigid)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
33 33 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Tue 12/20 2:46 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Melanie Miller.(Suda, Corey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Response to MSJ,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
32 32 respm Statement of Facts Wed 11/30 12:33 PM
STATEMENT OF FACTS Undisputed filed by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Alford, Brigid)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 11/30 12:32 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Alford, Brigid)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Summary Judgment Wed 11/30 12:30 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Alford, Brigid)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Table of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 2,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
29 29 misc Reply (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief) Tue 11/22 10:18 AM
REPLY by Melanie Miller. to26 Answer to Complaint REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES . (Suda, Corey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
28 28 misc Letter Wed 11/16 10:19 AM
Letter from Brigid Q. Alford to the Honorable Christopher C. Conner . (Alford, Brigid)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Letter Wed 11/16 8:53 AM
Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel to Judge . (Suda, Corey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
26 26 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/08 2:34 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Alford, Brigid)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1
Thursday, November 03, 2022
25 25 1 pgs order Order Thu 11/03 1:50 PM
ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that no later than Monday, November 21, 2022, the parties shall certify to the court by way of letter filed to the docket that they have met and conferred as directed and shall indicate whether a referral to a United States Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference is requested. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/3/2022. (mw)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 09/09 12:41 PM
ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Doc.7 ) to dismiss is DENIED without prejudice to defendant to reassert its grounds for relief after the full policy (including all declaration pages) is properly authenticated and presented as part of the record before the court. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/9/2022 (mw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 07/06 10:13 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Continue/Extension of Time - Fact Discovery due by 10/5/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 1/4/2023. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/6/2022 (mw)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Continue Wed 07/06 10:04 AM
MOTION to Continue (Joint) Case Management Deadlines by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Alford, Brigid)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 24, 2022
21 21 discov Disclosure Report Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)3 - Pretrial Disclosures Fri 06/24 11:45 AM
DISCLOSURE REPORT by Melanie Miller by Melanie Miller.(Suda, Corey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
20 20 1 pgs order Order Tue 02/22 9:09 AM
ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned civil action has been selected at random for mandatory referral to court-annexed mediation. Mediation is deferred pending the resolution of the pending motion to dismiss. The court will defer issuance of a mediation referral order until the motion is resolved. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 2/22/2022. (mw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
19 19 8 pgs order Order Thu 02/17 3:50 PM
CIVIL PRACTICE ORDER - SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 2/17/2022. (mw)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Case Management Order - Standard Track Thu 02/17 3:49 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Fact Discovery due by 7/6/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 10/5/2022. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 2/17/2022. (mw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
16 16 misc Case Management Plan Fri 02/11 11:26 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Melanie Miller. (Suda, Corey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
15 15 respm Reply Brief Tue 02/01 4:05 PM
REPLY BRIEF re7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Alford, Brigid)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Wed 01/19 9:17 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Docs. 11 and 12 deleted and replaced with Docs. 13 and 14. (gs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
14 14 misc Response (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief) Tue 01/18 3:22 PM
RESPONSE by Melanie Miller to7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . (Suda, Corey)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Tue 01/18 3:21 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Melanie Miller.(Suda, Corey)
Related: [-]
12 12 respm Reply Brief Tue 01/18 1:11 PM
REPLY BRIEF re7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Melanie Miller.(Suda, Corey)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Reply Brief Tue 01/18 1:10 PM
REPLY BRIEF re7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Melanie Miller.(Suda, Corey)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 01/18 3:15 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised that Doc. 11 is to be refiled as a Brief in Opposition and Doc. 12 is to be refiled as a Response. (gs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations) Thu 01/13 3:09 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Alford, Brigid)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
9 9 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/05 8:45 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 01:45 PM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 1/5/2022.(mw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Term. Calendar
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
8 8 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Tue 01/04 11:36 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Alford, Brigid)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss Tue 01/04 11:35 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Alford, Brigid)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, December 03, 2021
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 12/03 12:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Melanie Miller. USAA General Indemnity Company waiver sent on 11/18/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Suda, Corey)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Fri 12/03 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W Woodward on behalf of USAA General Indemnity Company (Woodward, Christopher)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Fri 12/03 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brigid Q. Alford on behalf of USAA General Indemnity Company (Alford, Brigid)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
3 3 2 pgs order Order Fri 11/05 4:12 PM
ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/5/2021. (mw)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 11/05 2:05 PM
Summons Issued as to USAA General Indemnity Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (eo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/05 2:05 PM
COMPLAINT against USAA General Indemnity Company ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5749276), filed by Melanie Miller.(eo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet