Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodney Smith
Case #: 9:21-cv-82044
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2021
Terminated:Dec 15, 2021
Last checked: Saturday May 07, 2022 5:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Ernie Ganz
Represented By
Michael David Piccolo
Lowndes, Drosdick, Doster, Kantor , Reed, P.A.
contact info
James Steven Toscano
Lowndes Drosdick Doster Kantor And Reed PA
contact info
Defendant
Lennie Ganz
Represented By
Michael David Piccolo
Lowndes, Drosdick, Doster, Kantor , Reed, P.A.
contact info
James Steven Toscano
Lowndes Drosdick Doster Kantor And Reed PA
contact info
Plaintiff
David Lester
1657 Woodwalk Strm SE
Atlanta, GA 30339
Plaintiff
Evangelos Stefanou
Plaintiff
Riley Stavely
4698 S. Hickory Level Rd.
Carrollton, GA 30116
Plaintiff
Vijayakrishna Pilla
10417 Bolivar Dr.
McKinney, TX 75072
Plaintiff
Sarah Peterson
317 Mower Place
Owatonna, MN 55060
Plaintiff
Daniel Peterson
317 Mower Place
Owatonna, MN 55060
Plaintiff
Brad Peterson
317 Mower Place
Owatonna, MN 55060
Plaintiff
Robert A. Patzwald
N75W14278 Northpoint Dr
Menomonee Falls, WI 53051
Plaintiff
John Oliver
1661 Market Street #536
Denver, CO 80202
Plaintiff
Philippa Oates
20362 Blackjack Road
Culpeper, VA 22701
Plaintiff
Danny Newell
33-36 Mott Avenue
Far Rockaway, NY 11691
Plaintiff
Scott A. Morris
3571 Far West Blvd. 50
Austin, TX 78731
Plaintiff
Brenda M. Morris
3571 Far West Blvd. 50
Austin, TX 78731
Plaintiff
Charles Minshew
3 Knotwood Ct
Spring, TX 77389
Plaintiff
James Meadows
6000 Howard Rd
Richmond, VA 23226
Plaintiff
Derek Leonard
3400 Coit Road # 261517
Plano, TX 75075
Plaintiff
Kranthi Kalagara
660 Rock Hill Rd
Prosper, TX 75078
Plaintiff
Andrew Haynes
216 Vista Verde
Carmel Valley, CA 93924
Plaintiff
Daniel Hanchett
525 Timberline DR
Lenoir City, TN 37772
Plaintiff
Saritha Erukula
10417 Bolivar Dr.
McKinney, TX 75072
Plaintiff
Kevin M. Elliott
P.O. Box 397
Nappanee, IN 46550
Plaintiff
Hanchett Dolores
525 Timberline Dr
Lenoir City, TN 37772
Plaintiff
R.T. De Vries
Plaintiff
Andrew De Luna
PO Box 667575
Houston, TX 77266
Plaintiff
Eswar Changhalasetty
5000 Whitestone Ln Apt 631
Plano, TX 75024
Plaintiff
Danielle Breteau


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
11 11 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 12/15 12:09 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 12/15 10:52 AM
MOTION for Nonsuit by listed Plaintiffs. (lbc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 09, 2021
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 12/09 10:19 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael David Piccolo on behalf of Ernie Ganz, Lennie Ganz. Attorney Michael David Piccolo added to party Ernie Ganz(pty:dft), Attorney Michael David Piccolo added to party Lennie Ganz(pty:dft). (Piccolo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
8 8 motion Dismiss Mon 11/29 11:22 AM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Ernie Ganz, Lennie Ganz. Responses due by 12/13/2021 (Toscano, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
7 7 7 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Tue 11/23 1:49 PM
ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/20/2021 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (jao)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
6 6 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 11/18 4:12 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Ernie Ganz served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; Lennie Ganz served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021. (jao)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 11/18 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Steven Toscano on behalf of Ernie Ganz, Lennie Ganz. Attorney James Steven Toscano added to party Ernie Ganz(pty:dft), Attorney James Steven Toscano added to party Lennie Ganz(pty:dft). (Toscano, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 11/08 1:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Lennie Ganz. (jao)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee) Mon 11/08 1:47 PM
Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 11/8/2021 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number FLS900007616 (jao)
Related: [-]
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/08 11:05 AM
COMPLAINT against Ernie Ganz, Lennie Ganz. Filing fees $ 402.00, filed by Scott A. Morris. Not Paid/No IFP.(pcs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 11/08 11:06 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
Related: [-]