Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Roy B Dalton, Jr
Referred: Leslie R Hoffman
Case #: 6:21-cv-01858
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2021
Terminated:Apr 11, 2022
Last checked: Saturday May 07, 2022 5:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Karla Johnson
Defendant
Diane L. Winfrey
Defendant
Jan Timothy Williams
Defendant
Kathryn D. Weston
Represented By
Linda Shaljani
Concourse Center Iv
contact info
Defendant
Victoria Gardens Homeowners Association, Inc.
Defendant
Lori V. Vaughan
Represented By
Lacy R. Harwell, Jr.
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info
Defendant
V.P. Homeowners Association, Inc.
Defendant
Sunmoon International Corporation
Defendant
Ronald I. Strauss
Defendant
Diane M. Simons
Defendant
Randall H. Rowe, III
Represented By
Linda Shaljani
Concourse Center Iv
contact info
Defendant
Laura Roth
Represented By
John Morgan Janousek
Roper, P.A.
contact info
Michael J. Roper
Bell & Roper, PA
contact info
Defendant
Mary Jo Pritchett
Defendant
Harlan G. Paul
Defendant
Charles Miller
Defendant
Correy B. Karbiener
Defendant
James Harvey
Defendant
Evergreen Lifestyles Management, LLC
Defendant
Carol Duchscher
Defendant
Lauren E. Dell
Defendant
James Clayton
Represented By
Linda Shaljani
Concourse Center Iv
contact info
Defendant
Mohammed Chowdhury
Defendant
Leonard Cechowski
Defendant
Kraig Carmickle
Defendant
Jesse Bynon
Defendant
Mark Bines
Defendant
Alfred Bacotti
Defendant
Carlos R. Arias
Defendant
Jodi Anderson
Plaintiff
Inez Christine Bracy
1742 S. Woodland Blvd., #218
DeLand, FL 32720


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 11, 2022
33 33 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/11 1:29 PM
ORDER granting 31 Motion to Dismiss; granting 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 22 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file.. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/11/2022. (YG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
32 32 utility *Remark Tue 03/01 9:49 AM
Remark: Doc.30 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/28/2022. (EP)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 28, 2022
31 31 motion Dismiss Mon 02/28 1:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss amended complaint with prejudice (Corrected) by Lori V. Vaughan. (Harwell, Lacy)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 25, 2022
30 30 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/25 5:41 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Lori V. Vaughan. (Harwell, Lacy)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Dismiss Fri 02/25 5:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss amended complaint with prejudice by Lori V. Vaughan. (Harwell, Lacy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
28 28 utility *Remark Tue 02/08 11:27 AM
Remark: Doc.19 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/8/2022. (LLM)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 31, 2022
27 27 misc Certificate of compliance Mon 01/31 10:27 AM
CERTIFICATE of compliance re22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with prejudice Doc.5 re MDFL L.R. 3.01(g)(3) by James Clayton, Randall H. Rowe, III, Kathryn D. Weston. (Shaljani, Linda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
26 26 utility *Remark Thu 01/27 12:09 PM
Remark: Doc.23 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/24/2022. (LLM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
25 25 motion Dismiss Fri 01/21 3:06 PM
Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Pursuant to M.D. FLA. Local Rule 3.01(g)(3) by Laura Roth. (Janousek, John)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/21 3:00 PM
NOTICE by Laura Roth of Pendency of Other Actions (Janousek, John)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/21 2:57 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Laura Roth. (Janousek, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
22 22 motion Dismiss Thu 01/20 2:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint [Doc.5] by James Clayton, Randall H. Rowe, III, Kathryn D. Weston. (Shaljani, Linda)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 17, 2022
21 21 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 01/17 6:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Laura Roth. (Janousek, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
20 20 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 01/14 3:52 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by James Clayton, Randall H. Rowe, III, Kathryn D. Weston. Related case(s): Yes (Shaljani, Linda)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/14 3:51 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re6 Order pdf by James Clayton, Randall H. Rowe, III, Kathryn D. Weston. (Shaljani, Linda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
18 18 notice Notice of appearance Wed 12/15 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Morgan Janousek on behalf of Laura Roth (Janousek, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Mon 12/13 8:54 AM
ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The deadline for Defendants Judge James R. Clayton, Judge Randell H. Rowe, III, and Judge Kathryn D. Weston to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended up to and including January 20, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 12/13/2021. (TYI)
Related: [-]
utility Set/reset deadlines/hearings-PUBLIC Tue 12/14 1:09 PM
Reset deadline: Answer due by 1/20/2022. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 09, 2021
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 12/09 2:07 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition Defendants Clayton, Weston and Rowe's15 Request for Extension of Time filed by Inez Christine Bracy. (BD)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Mon 12/06 11:02 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 Amended Complaint by James Clayton, Randall H. Rowe, III, Kathryn D. Weston. (Shaljani, Linda)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of appearance Mon 12/06 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Shaljani on behalf of James Clayton, Randall H. Rowe, III, Kathryn D. Weston (Shaljani, Linda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
13 13 utility *Remark Tue 11/23 11:05 AM
Remark: Doc.11 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/23/2021. (LLM)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 22, 2021
12 12 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 11/22 2:51 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Inez Christine Bracy. Related case(s): Yes (KNC)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/22 2:49 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re6 Order pdf by Inez Christine Bracy. (KNC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
10 10 order *Order no pdf Tue 11/16 5:55 PM
ENDORSED ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to seal Plaintiff's summonses (Doc. 2 ) because they include sensitive personal identifying information. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(e). Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/16/2021. (ABR)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 14, 2021
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/15 4:08 PM
CORRECTED NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Inez Christine Bracy re4 Notice of Lis Pendens (BD)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/15 3:00 PM
NOTICE (untitled) of Filing Additional Exhibits to5 Amended Complaint by Inez Christine Bracy re5 Amended Complaint(BD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Part 3,
Att: 2 Exhibit Part 4,
Att: 3 Exhibit Part 5
7 7 order *Order pdf Fri 11/12 4:25 PM
PRO SE ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/12/2021. (BIA) (CTP)
Related: [-]
6 6 order *Order pdf Fri 11/12 4:24 PM
INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/12/2021. (BIA) (CTP)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/12 1:14 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jodi Anderson, Carlos R. Arias, Alfred Bacotti, Mark Bines, Jesse Bynon, Kraig Carmickle, Leonard Cechowski, Mohammed Chowdhury, James Clayton, Lauren E. Dell, Carol Duchscher, Evergreen Lifestyles Management, LLC, James Harvey, Karla Johnson, Correy B. Karbiener, Charles Miller, Harlan G. Paul, Mary Jo Pritchett, Laura Roth, Randall H. Rowe, III, Diane M. Simons, Ronald I. Strauss, Sunmoon International Corporation, V.P. Homeowners Association, Inc., Lori V. Vaughan, Victoria Gardens Homeowners Association, Inc., Kathryn D. Weston, Jan Timothy Williams, Diane L. Winfrey with Jury Demand. filed through CM/ECF portal filed by Inez Christine Bracy.(RLK) (RLK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
3 3 order *Order pdf Tue 11/09 4:11 PM
ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to seal Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1 ). By Tuesday, November 23, 2021, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a redacted version of the Complaint that removes all personal identifying information consistent with this Order. Upon receipt of the redacted version, the Clerk is DIRECTED to strike the Complaint (Doc. 1 ) and remove it from the docket. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/9/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/10 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Inez Christine Bracy (BD)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons issued Mon 11/08 1:50 PM
SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (KNC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/08 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ORL101033 filed by Inez Christine Bracy.(KNC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Motion to Intervene,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Claim of Lien,
Att: 3 Exhibit C- No Records Response,
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Claim of Lien,
Att: 5 Exhibit E- Notice of Intent to Foreclose,
Att: 6 Exhibit F- Notice of Intent to Record,
Att: 7 Exhibit G- Final Judgment of Foreclosure, State Court,
Att: 8 Exhibit H- Order Denying Second Motion to Vacate,
Att: 9 Exhibit I- Motion for Reconsideration,
Att: 10 Exhibit J- Note,
Att: 11 Exhibit K- Motion to Strike,
Att: 12 Exhibit L- Envelope,
Att: 13 Exhibit M- Email and Permission to Use Email,
Att: 14 Civil Cover Sheet