Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:20-bk-50588

Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 4:21-ap-05015
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2021
Terminated:Jul 21, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ronald Leebert Fontenot, Defendant
1740 Providence Highway
Rayne, LA 70578
Represented By
Ronald Leebert Fontenot
contact info
Plaintiff
David W. Asbach, Plaintiff
Office of United States Trustee 300 Fannin Street Suite 3196
Shreveport, LA 71101
Represented By
Anna Haugen
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info

GPO Apr 20 2023
Memorandum Ruling(Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law) (Re: 1 Complaint) Filed on 4/20/2023 (ezra). (ezra).

Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
45 45 court Transcript Wed 09/18 9:15 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 12/08/22 THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING, TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 12/17/2024. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber J & J Court Transcribers, Inc., Telephone number 609-586-2311. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/25/2024. Redaction Request Due By 10/9/2024. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 10/21/2024. Transcript access will be restricted through 12/17/2024. (jean)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 07/21 11:24 AM
Disposition of Adversary - Granted. Judgment For Plaintiff. 21-5015 (melo)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 07/21 11:26 AM
Adversary Case Closed. 21-5015 (melo)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 23, 2023
44 44 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 04/23 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 43 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Thursday, April 20, 2023
43 43 court Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law - AP Fri 04/21 7:35 AM
Memorandum Ruling(Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law) Related [+] Filed on 4/20/2023 (ezra). (ezra)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, April 14, 2023
42 42 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 04/14 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 41 Judgment/Order
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
41 41 order Judgment/Order - AP Wed 04/12 3:34 PM
Judgment For Plaintiff, Acting U.S. Trustee David W. Asbach and Against Defendant, Ronald Leebert Fontenot. Related [+] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the discharge granted on November 17, 2020 in the main bankruptcy case,No. 2050588, is REVOKED. (kati)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
court Hearing Held - Other Wed 04/12 2:17 PM
Hearing Held on Related [+]. APPEARANCES IN PERSON: Anna Haugen for U.S. Trustee; D. Patrick Keating for Debtor. RULING: Ruling in favor of U.S. Trustee. Discharge is revoked. Order - Court. (kati)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, April 01, 2023
40 40 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/01 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/01/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 39 Order to Set Hearing
Thursday, March 30, 2023
39 39 order Set Hearing - AP Thu 03/30 10:51 AM
Order Resetting Hearing for Ruling on Related [+]. Filed on 3/30/2023. Hearing scheduled for 4/11/2023 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom Five, Lafayette. (kati)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, December 08, 2022
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 12/08 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 12/08/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Order
37 37 misc Exhibit Thu 12/08 2:53 PM
Witness List: Lucy Sikes - trustee, Ronald Fontenot - Debtor. Exhibits admitted in open court Related [+]. 13A and 14A were filed in open court by Anna Haugen, UST. (kati)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
court Hearing Held - Trial Thu 12/08 2:36 PM
Trial Hearing Held on Related [+]. APPEARANCES IN PERSON: Antony Constanti for US Trustee; Anna Haugen for US Trustee; Lucy Sikes Trustee; David Keating for Debtor; Ronald Fontenot - Debtor. RULING: Matter taken under advisement. Order - N/A. (kati)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
36 36 misc Exhibit Tue 12/06 4:31 PM
Exhibit(s) Ex. 19 Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach (Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-]
35 35 8 pgs order Order (Generic) - AP Tue 12/06 8:42 AM
Proposed Joint Pretrial Order Related [+]. Filed on 12/6/2022. (kati)
Related: [-] 17 Scheduling Order from PTC Limiting Time for Completion of Discovery and Scheduling Trial
Thursday, December 01, 2022
34 34 misc Support Document Thu 12/01 9:23 PM
Support Document: to Related [+] Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach (Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-] 17 Scheduling Order
33 33 misc Brief Thu 12/01 4:54 PM
Pre-Trial Brief Filed by David Patrick Keating on behalf of Ronald Leebert Fontenot (Keating, David)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Statement Thu 12/01 4:53 PM
Statement Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Filed by David Patrick Keating on behalf of Ronald Leebert Fontenot (Keating, David)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Support Document Thu 12/01 4:42 PM
Support Document: to Related [+] Proposed Joint Pretrial Order Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach (Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-] 17 Scheduling Order
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
30 30 misc Exhibit List Wed 11/30 11:06 AM
Third Witness List Attaching Exhibit 17 - Deposition Transcript and Exhibits , Exhibit List Related [+] Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach (Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-] 26 Witness List, Exhibit List
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - Deposition Transcript
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - Deposition Transcript Exhibits
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
29 29 misc Exhibit List Tue 11/29 1:11 PM
Exhibit List Related [+] Attaching Exhibit #18 , Witness List Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach (Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-] 26 Witness List, Exhibit List
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - Chapter 7 Trustees Correspondence with Counsel for Defendant
28 28 misc Exhibit List Tue 11/29 9:28 AM
Exhibit List Related [+] Attaching Exhibit #14 , Witness List Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach (Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-] 26 Witness List, Exhibit List
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Basile State Bank #1
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Basile State Bank #2
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Basile State Bank #3
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Basile State Bank #4
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
27 27 misc Exhibit List Wed 11/23 2:06 PM
Exhibit List , Witness List Filed by David Patrick Keating on behalf of Ronald Leebert Fontenot (Keating, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
26 26 misc Exhibit List Tue 11/22 5:53 PM
Witness List and , Exhibit List Related [+] Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach (Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit a.Ex. 1 Petition, Scheduled and Statement of Financial Affairs with Defendants wet signatures
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Secretary of State Records
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 September 11, 2020, 11 U.S.C. § 341 Meeting of Creditors Transcript
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 October 7, 2021, 11 U.S.C. § 341 Meeting of Creditors Transcript
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 5 Capital Bank Account Statements
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. 6 Chapter 7 Trustee Motion to Approve Settlement
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. 7 2019, 2020 Tax Returns
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. 8 Bill of Sale
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. 9 Cajun Harley Davidson Document Production
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex. 10 Donald Richard Correspondence and Ledger
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex. 11 2011 Harley Davidson Chain of Title
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex. 12 J.D. Bank Proof of Claim
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex. 13 Washington State Bank Document Production
Att: 14 Exhibit Ex. 15 Defendants Initial Disclosures
Att: 15 Exhibit Ex. 16 Defendants Production of Documents
Sunday, November 06, 2022
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 11/06 10:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 11/06/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Friday, November 04, 2022
24 24 order Extend Time Fri 11/04 4:29 PM
Order Granting Related [+]. (kati)
Related: [-] 22 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time Discovery Completion Deadline filed by Plaintiff David W. Asbach
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
23 23 notice Notice to Take Deposition Tue 11/01 8:34 AM
Notice to Take Deposition of Rescheduled Deposition of Ronald Leebert Fontenot, November 21, 2022 @ 1:00 p.m., John M. Shaw United States Courthouse 800 Lafayette Street Room 3014, 3rd Floor Lafayette, Louisiana 70501 Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach (Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
22 22 motion Extend Time Fri 10/28 4:09 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time Discovery Completion Deadline with Certificate of Service Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach (Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
21 21 notice Notice Re: Tue 10/11 12:50 PM
Notice Related [+] Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Basile State Bank Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach(Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Basile State Bank Subpoena
Att: 2 Basile State Bank Subpoena Exhibit 1
20 20 notice Notice to Take Deposition Tue 10/11 12:38 PM
Notice to Take Deposition of Rescheduled Deposition of Ronald Leebert Fontenot, October 28, 2022 @ 1:00 p.m., John M. Shaw United States Courthouse 800 Lafayette Street Room 3014, 3rd Floor Lafayette, Louisiana 70501 Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach (Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
19 19 notice Notice to Take Deposition Thu 08/25 11:36 AM
Notice to Take Deposition of Ronald Leebert Fontenot, October 7 @ 1:00 p.m., John M. Shaw United States Courthouse 800 Lafayette Street Room 3014, 3rd Floor Lafayette, Louisiana 70501 Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach (Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/27 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/27/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Scheduling Order
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
17 17 order Scheduling Order - AP Wed 05/25 3:43 PM
Scheduling Order from PTC Limiting Time for Completion of Discovery and Scheduling Trial. Pre-Trial Order due by 12/1/2022. Discovery due by 11/8/2022. Trial date set for 12/8/2022 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom Five, Lafayette. Continued Trial date set for 12/9/2022 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom Five, Lafayette. (micc)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held - Other Wed 05/25 3:37 PM
Hearing Held on Related [+]. APPEARANCES BY WEBEX: Anna Haugen for US Trustee. RULING: Trial is scheduled for December 8 and 9, 2022 at 10:00am. Order: Haugen (micc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of Withdrawal - Generic Tue 05/24 11:40 AM
Notice of Withdrawal Related [+] with Certificate of Service Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach (Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing
15 15 motion Continue Hearing Tue 05/24 9:58 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On Related [+] with Certificate of Service Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach (Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-] 3 New Adversary Proceeding and Scheduling Order - AP
Friday, April 29, 2022
14 14 notice Notice Re: Fri 04/29 8:19 AM
Notice Related [+] Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Cajun Cycles dba Cajun Harley Davidson Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach(Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Cajun Cylces Subpoena
Att: 2 Subpoena Exhibit
Thursday, February 03, 2022
13 13 notice Notice Re: Thu 02/03 1:11 PM
Notice Related [+] Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Block Inc. Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach(Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Block Inc Subpoena
Att: 2 Subpoena Exhibit
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
12 12 notice Notice Re: Tue 02/01 8:46 AM
Notice Related [+] Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena on The Bank of Missouri Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach(Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Subpoena
Att: 2 Subpoena Exhibit
Thursday, December 23, 2021
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/23 12:57 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by David Patrick Keating on behalf of Ronald Leebert Fontenot(Keating, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Verification
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
10 10 notice Notice Re: Tue 11/23 7:13 AM
Notice Related [+] Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Washington State Bank Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach(Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Subpoena Washington State Bank
Thursday, November 18, 2021
9 9 notice Notice Re: Thu 11/18 2:19 PM
Notice Related [+] Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Venmo Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach(Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Venmo Subpoena
8 8 notice Notice Re: Thu 11/18 12:39 PM
Notice Related [+] Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena on PayPal Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach(Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 PayPal Subpoena
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
7 7 notice Notice Re: Wed 11/17 2:32 PM
Notice Related [+] Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Capital One Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach(Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Capital One Subpoena
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/16 1:54 PM
Summons Service Executed on Ronald Leebert Fontenot 11/16/2021 . (Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/10 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. Notice Date 11/10/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 New Adversary Proceeding and Scheduling Order - AP
Monday, November 08, 2021
4 4 court Summons Issued Mon 11/08 3:30 PM
Summons Issued (1) (micc)
Related: [-]
3 3 order New Adversary Proceeding and Scheduling Order - AP Mon 11/08 3:28 PM
Scheduling Order Setting Deadlines and Trial Docket Call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date is set for 5/25/2022 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom Five, Lafayette. Filed on 11/8/2021 (micc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 misc Support Document Mon 11/08 2:28 PM
Support Document: to Related [+] Adversary Cover Sheet Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of David W. Asbach (Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
1 1 cmp Complaint (Fee) Mon 11/08 2:25 PM
Adversary case 21-05015 (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))): Complaint PURSUANT 11 U.S.C. § 727(d)(1), § 727(d)(2), § 727(e)(1) by David W. Asbach (attorneys Anna Haugen, Anna Haugen) against Ronald Leebert Fontenot. Receipt Number UST, Fee Amount Due $350 (Haugen, Anna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Military Status Report
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8