Golden v. Family Fare, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:19-bk-36314
Lead BK case is: 4:19-bk-36314
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:21-ap-04111 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 08, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 29, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Family Fare, LLC
2285 84th Street SW
Byron Center, MI 49315 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel H. Golden, as Liquidating Trustee of the DFC Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/22/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Wednesday, November 29, 2023 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 11/29 3:21 PM
Adversary Case 4:21-ap-4111 Closed. (RosarioSaldana) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 11:59 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
Wed 09/28 9:14 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Daniel H. Golden (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Tuesday, June 07, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice
Tue 06/07 10:42 AM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures . Filed by Daniel H. Golden (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Friday, January 28, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/28 2:25 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Family Fare, LLC (Grow, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, January 27, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 01/27 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/27/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, January 25, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order to Appear pro hac vice
Tue 01/25 1:04 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice - Stephen B. Grow Signed on 1/25/2022. (emiller) |
|
Friday, January 21, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 01/25 12:59 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Stephen B. Grow . Filed by Defendant Family Fare, LLC (emiller) |
|
Wednesday, November 24, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 11/24 7:28 PM
Summons Service Executed on Family Fare, LLC 11/22/2021. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Wednesday, November 17, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Wed 11/17 9:55 PM
Summons Issued on Family Fare, LLC Date Issued 11/16/2021. (hler) |
|
Friday, November 12, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Fri 11/12 8:11 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Family Fare, LLC dba Tadych's EconoFoods. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Thursday, November 11, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 11/11 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/11/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, November 10, 2021 | ||
crditcrd
none
Wed 11/10 6:28 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 21-04111 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23365881. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, November 09, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Tue 11/09 6:00 AM
|
|
Monday, November 08, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Mon 11/08 1:44 PM
Adversary case 21-04111 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by Daniel H. Golden against Family Fare, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |