Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:19-bk-36314

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:21-ap-04178
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2021
Terminated:Nov 29, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Safari Micro, Inc.
2185 W. Pecos Road Suite 9
Chandler, AZ 85224
Represented By
Safari Micro, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel H. Golden, as Liquidating Trustee of the DFC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Daniel H. Golden
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Wed 11/29 3:52 PM
Adversary Case 4:21-ap-4178 Closed. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
court Case Reassigned-Adversary Tue 10/17 12:32 PM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 02/16 11:10 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Daniel H. Golden(Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 11/24 3:08 PM
Summons Service Executed on Safari Micro, Inc. 11/22/2021. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
5 5 court Summons Issued Thu 11/18 10:21 AM
Summons Issued on Safari Micro, Inc. Date Issued 11/16/2021. (hler)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/12 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/12/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
3 3 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Fri 11/12 12:29 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Safari Micro, Inc.. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
2 2 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary) Wed 11/10 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 11/10 6:33 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 21-04178 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23365953. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Tue 11/09 10:32 AM
Adversary case 21-04178 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by Daniel H. Golden against Safari Micro, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A