Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas W Thrash, Jr
Referred: Linda T Walker
Case #: 1:21-cv-04611
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2021
Terminated:May 18, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday May 04, 2022 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Express Lien, Inc.
Represented By
David John Forestner
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Grace L. Williams
Represented By
Kris Kelly Skaar
Skaar & Feagle, LLP
contact info
James Marvin Feagle
Skaar And Feagle LLP
contact info
Justin Tharpe Holcombe
Skaar & Feagle, LLP
contact info
Clifton R. Dorsen
Skaar And Feagle LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 26, 2023
utility Docket Correction Fri 05/26 2:41 PM
Notification of Docket Correction re32 Mail Returned. (jkb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 2:49 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Cobb County State Court with remand letter, remand order and docket sheet. Called and verified this is the correct address. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
32 32 misc Mail Returned Tue 05/23 2:44 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Grace L. Williams re31 Letter,30 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court (jkb)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Letter Thu 05/18 11:48 AM
Remand Letter to State Court of Cobb County (jkb)
Related: [-]
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Thu 05/18 11:38 AM
ORDER granting29 Motion to Remand to State Court of Cobb County. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/18/2023. (jkb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 05/18 11:39 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker terminated from case. (jkb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/18 11:53 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to State Court of Cobb County. Remand Letter, Remand Order & Docket Sheet. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
29 29 motion Remand to State Court Mon 05/08 6:37 PM
Consent MOTION to Remand to State Court of Cobb County, Georgia with Brief In Support by Grace L. Williams.(Feagle, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Settlement Agreement and Release of Claims executed by parties and counsel
Monday, May 01, 2023
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 05/01 9:14 AM
ORDER granting27 Third MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiff to File Motion for Class Certification re:26 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, . Plaintiff shall file her Motion for Class Certification or other appropriate motion (including a motion to remand to the State Court of Cobb County) on or before 05/12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 05/01/2023. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
27 27 3 pgs motion Extension of Time Fri 04/28 4:24 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiff to File Motion for Class Certification re:26 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by Express Lien, Inc.. (Forestner, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 04/03 8:28 AM
ORDER granting25 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion for class certification or other appropriate motion re:24 Order on Motion for Extension of Time . Plaintiff shall file her Motion for Class Certification or other appropriate motion (including a motion to remand to the State Court of Cobb County) on or before 04/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 03/31/2023. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
25 25 2 pgs motion Extension of Time Tue 03/28 6:39 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion for class certification or other appropriate motion re:24 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, with Brief In Support by Grace L. Williams.(Skaar, Kris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, February 27, 2023
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 02/28 8:45 AM
ORDER23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion for class certification or other appropriate motion re:22 Order, Set Submission Deadline. Plaintiff shall file her Motion for Class Certification or other appropriate motion (including a motion to remand to the State Court of Cobb County) within thirty (30) days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 02/27/2023. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
23 23 2 pgs motion Extension of Time Fri 02/24 4:49 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion for class certification or other appropriate motion re:22 Order, Set Submission Deadline with Brief In Support by Grace L. Williams.(Skaar, Kris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Tue 11/29 4:52 PM
ORDER for plaintiff to file her Motion for Class Certification within ninety (90) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 11/29/2022. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
21 21 minutes Settlement Conference Wed 10/05 4:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath: Settlement Conference held on 10/4/2022.The parties participated in a settlement conference and reached a settlement agreement. Judge J. Elizabeth McBath terminated as the settlement judge. (Tape #Zoom)(jra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
20 20 4 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Fri 09/16 11:15 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION: Mediation Hearing set for 10/4/2022 at 10:00 AM in via video-conference before Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 9/15/2022. (jra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
19 19 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/16 4:07 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the stay originally issued in this Courts April 13, 2022 Order shall be extended at the joint request of the parties and that the case will be assigned to the next available magistrate judge for mediation. It is further ORDERED that all terms in the original Order shall apply and that the parties shall file a status report within 7 days after the conclusion of the mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 8/16/2022. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Settlement Judge Tue 08/16 4:09 PM
CASE REFERRED to Settlement Judge Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 08/16 4:14 PM
Submission of19 Order to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (ane)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
18 18 misc Status Report Mon 08/15 9:48 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Grace L. Williams.(Feagle, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, June 16, 2022
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Fri 06/17 8:46 AM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the stay originally issued in this Court's April 13, 2022 Order13 shall be extended at the joint request of the parties until August 15, 2022. It is further ORDERED that all terms in the original Order shall apply and that the parties shall file a status report on or before August 15, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 6/16/22. (jra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
16 16 misc Status Report Wed 06/15 3:35 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Grace L. Williams.(Feagle, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, May 16, 2022
15 15 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 05/16 3:36 PM
ORDER granting14 Unopposed MOTION To Enter Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 5/16/2022. (jra)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 14, 2022
14 14 motion Protective Order Sat 05/14 1:36 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Grace L. Williams.(Skaar, Kris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order - Stipulated Protective Order
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 04/13 2:06 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the12 Joint Motion to Stay Case and Request for Scheduling Order is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 4/13/2022. (jra)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
12 12 motion Stay Mon 04/11 9:37 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Case and Request for Scheduling Order by Grace L. Williams.(Feagle, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, February 17, 2022
11 11 discov Certificate of Service Thu 02/17 4:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Express Lien, Inc..(Forestner, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
10 10 discov Certificate of Service Mon 02/07 3:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's 1st Requests for Production and Interrogatories to Grace Williams by Express Lien, Inc..(Forestner, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
9 9 discov Certificate of Service Tue 01/18 5:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests by Grace L. Williams.(Skaar, Kris)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
8 8 discov Certificate of Service Tue 01/04 10:41 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's Rule 26 (a)(1) Disclosures by Express Lien, Inc..(Forestner, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
7 7 discov Certificate of Service Mon 01/03 5:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Grace L. Williams.(Skaar, Kris)
Related: [-]
6 6 12 pgs order Scheduling Order Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice Mon 01/03 12:45 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER on5 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan and Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Class discovery will end on April 13, 2022. A motion for class certification must be filed by May 13, 2022. Summary Judgment motions or Consolidated Pretrial Order due 30 days after close of discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 1/3/2022. (anc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 31, 2021
5 5 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Fri 12/31 12:20 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Grace L. Williams. (Feagle, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 12/13 11:37 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Extension of Time. The due date for the Joint Preliminary Planning Report and Discovery Plan and the Parties' Initial Disclosures is hereby extended through and including Monday, January 3, 2022, and the commencement of the discovery period shall begin on January 3, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 12/13/2021. (anc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
3 3 motion Extension of Time Fri 12/10 2:43 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, to serve Initial Disclosures, and to commence discovery period by Grace L. Williams.(Skaar, Kris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, November 12, 2021
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Fri 11/12 11:21 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Express Lien, Inc.. Discovery ends on 4/11/2022.(Forestner, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 11/09 2:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Express Lien, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11378078)(eop)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit -A,
Att: 2 Exhibit -B,
Att: 3 Exhibit -C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet