Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-02105
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2021
Last checked: Monday May 09, 2022 4:59 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
2345 Rice Street Suite 230
Roseville, MN 55113
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
WARREN RAY VANTREESE, JR
Represented By
TAYLOR CHRISTOPHER BARTLETT
Heninger Garrison Davis Llc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/01 9:33 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by WARREN RAY VANTREESE, JR. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
4 4 misc Docket Annotation Wed 11/10 3:01 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer Re1 Complaint filed by WARREN RAY VANTREESE, JR., contains the wrong PDF image (partially). Please re-file the correct document as an amended complaint. (djb)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 11/10 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - Western District of Texas by WARREN RAY VANTREESE, JR (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 11/10 10:07 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/10 10:01 AM
COMPLAINT 3:21-cv-02105 against All Defendants, filed by WARREN RAY VANTREESE, JR. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee for Multidistrict Litigation (MDL) Case Wed 11/10 10:48 AM
Payment of Filing Fee ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6539263), filed by WARREN RAY VANTREESE, JR. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]