USA v. SIROIS et al
Maine District Court | |
Case #: | 1:21-cr-00175 |
Case Filed: | Nov 09, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 11, 2021 2:25 AM EST |
Defendant
KENNETH ALLEN (9)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DAVID BURGESS (2)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BRANDON DAGNESE (7)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DERRICK DOUCETTE (4)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LAKEMONT LLC (12)
|
|
Defendant
KEVIN LEMAY (11)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JAMES MCLAMB (10)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RYAN NEZOL (8)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SANDY RIVER PROPERTIES LLC (13)
|
|
Defendant
BRADLEY SCOVIL (3)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALISA SIROIS (5)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LUCAS SIROIS (1)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBERT SIROIS (6)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SPRUCE VALLEY LLC (14)
|
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/12/2024 12:48 PM EST |
Wednesday, October 20, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
2 | 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal as to LUCAS SIROIS (1), DAVID BURGESS (2), BRADLEY SCOVIL (3), DERRICK DOUCETTE (4), ALISA SIROIS (5), ROBERT SIROIS (6), BRANDON DAGNESE (7), RYAN NEZOL (8), KENNETH ALLEN (9), JAMES MCLAMB (10), KEVIN LEMAY (11), KAYLA ALVES (12) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
18 | 18
![]() |
|
19 | 19
![]() |
|
20 | 20
![]() |
|
21 | 21
![]() |
|
22 | 22
![]() |
|
23 | 23
![]() |
|
24 | 24
![]() |
|
25 | 25
![]() |
|
26 | 26
![]() |
|
27 | 27
![]() |
|
Thursday, October 21, 2021 | ||
43 | 43 NOTICE OF HEARING as to LUCAS SIROIS Counsel are reminded of Amended General Order 2021-6 regarding Masks, Courthouse Entrance Protocols and Social Distancing. Initial Appearance set for 10/28/2021 09:30 AM in Bangor Courtroom 1 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
44 | 44 NOTICE OF HEARING as to DAVID BURGESS Counsel are reminded of Amended General Order 2021-6 regarding Masks, Courthouse Entrance Protocols and Social Distancing. Initial Appearance set for 10/28/2021 10:30 AM in Bangor Courtroom 1 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
45 | 45 NOTICE OF HEARING as to BRADLEY SCOVIL Counsel are reminded of Amended General Order 2021-6 regarding Masks, Courthouse Entrance Protocols and Social Distancing. Initial Appearance set for 10/28/2021 02:00 PM in Bangor Courtroom 1 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
46 | 46 NOTICE OF HEARING as to DERRICK DOUCETTE Counsel are reminded of Amended General Order 2021-6 regarding Masks, Courthouse Entrance Protocols and Social Distancing. Initial Appearance set for 10/28/2021 03:00 PM in Bangor Courtroom 1 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
47 | 47 NOTICE OF HEARING as to ALISA SIROIS Counsel are reminded of Amended General Order 2021-6 regarding Masks, Courthouse Entrance Protocols and Social Distancing. Initial Appearance set for 10/29/2021 10:30 AM in Bangor Courtroom 2 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
48 | 48 NOTICE OF HEARING as to ROBERT SIROIS Counsel are reminded of Amended General Order 2021-6 regarding Masks, Courthouse Entrance Protocols and Social Distancing. Initial Appearance set for 10/29/2021 09:30 AM in Bangor Courtroom 2 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
49 | 49 NOTICE OF HEARING as to BRANDON DAGNESE Counsel are reminded of Amended General Order 2021-6 regarding Masks, Courthouse Entrance Protocols and Social Distancing. Initial Appearance set for 10/29/2021 11:30 AM in Bangor Courtroom 2 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
50 | 50 NOTICE OF HEARING as to RYAN NEZOL Counsel are reminded of Amended General Order 2021-6 regarding Masks, Courthouse Entrance Protocols and Social Distancing. Initial Appearance set for 10/29/2021 03:00 PM in Bangor Courtroom 2 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
51 | 51 NOTICE OF HEARING as to KENNETH ALLEN Counsel are reminded of Amended General Order 2021-6 regarding Masks, Courthouse Entrance Protocols and Social Distancing. Initial Appearance set for 10/29/2021 02:00 PM in Bangor Courtroom 2 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
52 | 52 NOTICE OF HEARING as to JAMES MCLAMB Counsel are reminded of Amended General Order 2021-6 regarding Masks, Courthouse Entrance Protocols and Social Distancing. Initial Appearance set for 10/28/2021 01:00 PM in Bangor Courtroom 1 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
53 | 53 NOTICE OF HEARING as to KEVIN LEMAY Counsel are reminded of Amended General Order 2021-6 regarding Masks, Courthouse Entrance Protocols and Social Distancing. Initial Appearance set for 10/28/2021 11:30 AM in Bangor Courtroom 1 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
Friday, October 22, 2021 | ||
55 | 55
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, October 25, 2021 | ||
56 | 56
![]() |
|
57 | 57
![]() |
|
58 | 58
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
59 | 59
![]() |
|
60 | 60
![]() |
|
61 | 61
![]() |
|
Tuesday, October 26, 2021 | ||
63 | 63
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
64 | 64
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 27, 2021 | ||
Case unsealed as to LUCAS SIROIS, DAVID BURGESS, BRADLEY SCOVIL, DERRICK DOUCETTE, ALISA SIROIS, ROBERT SIROIS, BRANDON DAGNESE, RYAN NEZOL, KENNETH ALLEN, JAMES MCLAMB, KEVIN LEMAY, KAYLA ALVES (jwr) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | ||
65 | 65
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
66 | 66
![]() |
|
67 | 67 ORDER granting66 Motion to Unseal Case as to LUCAS SIROIS (1), DAVID BURGESS (2), DERRICK DOUCETTE (4), ALISA SIROIS (5), ROBERT SIROIS (6), BRANDON DAGNESE (7), RYAN NEZOL (8), KENNETH ALLEN (9), JAMES MCLAMB (10), KEVIN LEMAY (11), KAYLA ALVES (12) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
68 | 68 ORDER granting66 Motion to Unseal Case and Related Materials as to BRADLEY SCOVIL (3) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
69 | 69
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, October 28, 2021 | ||
70 | 70
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
72 | 72
![]() |
|
73 | 73
![]() |
|
74 | 74
![]() |
|
75 | 75
![]() |
|
76 | 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON:Initial Appearance held as to LUCAS SIROIS. Bond Hearing held as to LUCAS SIROIS, Bond set as to LUCAS SIROIS (1) $500,000 Secured Bond Made by LUCAS SIROIS in amount of $ $500,000. (Court Reporter: FTR) (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
77 | 77 ORDER as to LUCAS SIROIS: Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, Pub.L.No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21,2020) and Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is reminded of its obligation to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant, that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland 383 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. So Ordered. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
78 | 78
![]() |
|
79 | 79
![]() |
|
80 | 80
![]() |
|
81 | 81 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON:Initial Appearance held as to DAVID BURGESS. Bond Hearing held as to DAVID BURGESS. Personal Recognizance Bond set and Made as to DAVID BURGESS. (Court Reporter: FTR) (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
82 | 82 ORDER as to DAVID BURGESS: Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, Pub.L.No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21,2020) and Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is reminded of its obligation to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant, that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland 383 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. So Ordered. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
83 | 83
![]() |
|
84 | 84
![]() |
|
85 | 85
![]() |
|
87 | 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON:Initial Appearance held as to KEVIN LEMAY. Bond Hearing held as to KEVIN LEMAY. Personal Recognizance Bond Set and Made as to KEVIN LEMAY. (Court Reporter: FTR) (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
88 | 88 ORDER as to KEVIN LEMAY: Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, Pub.L.No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21,2020) and Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is reminded of its obligation to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant, that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland 383 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. So Ordered. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
89 | 89
![]() |
|
90 | 90
![]() |
|
91 | 91 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON:Initial Appearance held as to JAMES MCLAMB. Bond Hearing held as to JAMES MCLAMB. Personal Recognizance Bond Set and Made by JAMES MCLAMB. (Court Reporter: FTR) (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
92 | 92
![]() |
|
93 | 93 ORDER as to JAMES MCLAMB: Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, Pub.L.No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21,2020) and Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is reminded of its obligation to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant, that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland 383 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. So Ordered. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
94 | 94
![]() |
|
95 | 95
![]() |
|
96 | 96
![]() |
|
97 | 97 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Initial Appearance held as to BRADLEY SCOVIL. Bond Hearing held as to BRADLEY SCOVIL. Bond set as to BRADLEY SCOVIL (3) Personal Recognizance Bond Set and Made as to BRADLEY SCOVIL (Court Reporter: FTR) (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
98 | 98 ORDER as to BRADLEY SCOVIL: Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, Pub.L.No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21,2020) and Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is reminded of its obligation to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant, that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland 383 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. So Ordered. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
99 | 99
![]() |
|
100 | 100
![]() |
|
101 | 101
![]() |
|
102 | 102
![]() |
|
103 | 103 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON:Initial Appearance held as to DERRICK DOUCETTE. Bond Hearing held as to DERRICK DOUCETT. Personal Recognizance Bond Set and Made as to DERRICK DOUCETTE. (Court Reporter: FTR) (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
104 | 104 ORDER as to DERRICK DOUCETTE: Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, Pub.L.No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21,2020) and Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is reminded of its obligation to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant, that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland 383 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. So Ordered. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
105 | 105
![]() |
|
106 | 106
![]() |
|
Friday, October 29, 2021 | ||
Set Deadlines as to KENNETH ALLEN: Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Local Counsel, Jeffrey Silverstein must file a Proc Hac Vice Certificate after which PHV Attorney Robert Fedor must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 11/5/2021. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | ||
107 | 107 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON:Initial Appearance held as to ROBERT SIROIS. Bond Hearing held as to ROBERT SIROIS. Personal Recognizance Bond Set and Made as to ROBERT SIROIS. (Court Reporter: FTR) (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
108 | 108 ORDER as to ROBERT SIROIS: Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, Pub.L.No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21,2020) and Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is reminded of its obligation to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant, that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland 383 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. So Ordered. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
109 | 109
![]() |
|
110 | 110
![]() |
|
111 | 111
![]() |
|
112 | 112 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON:Initial Appearance held as to ALISA SIROIS. Bond Hearing held as to ALISA SIROIS. Personal Recognizance Bond Set and Made as to ALISA SIROIS. (Court Reporter: FTR) (mlm)[1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
113 | 113 ORDER as to ALISA SIROIS: Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, Pub.L.No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21,2020) and Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is reminded of its obligation to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant, that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland 383 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. So Ordered. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
114 | 114
![]() |
|
115 | 115
![]() |
|
116 | 116 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON:Initial Appearance held as to BRANDON DAGNESE. Bond Hearing held as to BRANDON DAGNESE. Personal Recognizance Bond Set and Made as to BRANDON DAGNESE. (Court Reporter: FTR) (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
117 | 117
![]() |
|
118 | 118
![]() |
|
119 | 119 ORDER as to BRANDON DAGNESE: Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, Pub.L.No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21,2020) and Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is reminded of its obligation to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant, that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland 383 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. So Ordered. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
120 | 120
![]() |
|
126 | 126
![]() |
|
127 | 127 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON:Initial Appearance held as to KENNETH ALLEN. Bond Hearing held as to KENNETH ALLEN. Personal Recognizance Bond Set and Made as to KENNETH ALLEN. (Court Reporter: FTR) (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
128 | 128 ORDER as to KENNETH ALLEN: Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, Pub.L.No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21,2020) and Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is reminded of its obligation to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant, that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland 383 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. So Ordered. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
129 | 129
![]() |
|
130 | 130
![]() |
|
131 | 131 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON:Initial Appearance held as to RYAN NEZOL. Bond Hearing held as to RYAN NEZOL. Personal Recognizance Bond Set and Made as to RYAN NEZOL. (Court Reporter: FTR) (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
132 | 132 ORDER as to RYAN NEZOL: Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, Pub.L.No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21,2020) and Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is reminded of its obligation to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant, that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland 383 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. So Ordered. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mlm) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
133 | 133
![]() |
|
134 | 134
![]() |
|
135 | 135
![]() |
|
Monday, November 01, 2021 | ||
Set Deadlines as to LUCAS SIROIS : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Kenneth Fredette must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 11/5/2021. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (jwr) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | ||
136 | 136 NOTICE OF HEARING as to LUCAS SIROIS, DAVID BURGESS, BRADLEY SCOVIL, DERRICK DOUCETTE, JAMES MCLAMB, KEVIN LEMAY Counsel are reminded of Amended General Order 2021-6 regarding Masks, Courthouse Entrance Protocols and Social Distancing. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/18/2021 08:30 AM in Bangor Courtroom 2 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
137 | 137 NOTICE OF HEARING as to ALISA SIROIS, ROBERT SIROIS, BRANDON DAGNESE, RYAN NEZOL, KENNETH ALLEN Counsel are reminded of Amended General Order 2021-6 regarding Masks, Courthouse Entrance Protocols and Social Distancing. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/19/2021 08:30 AM in Bangor Courtroom 2 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr) [1:21-mj-00271-JCN] | |
Tuesday, November 02, 2021 | ||
139 | 139
![]() |
|
Wednesday, November 03, 2021 | ||
142 | 142
![]() |
|
Friday, November 05, 2021 | ||
148 | 148
![]() |
|
Tuesday, November 09, 2021 | ||
149 | 149
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
150 | 150
![]() |
|
152 | 152
![]() |
|
154 | 154
![]() |
|
156 | 156
![]() |
|
158 | 158
![]() |
|
160 | 160
![]() |
|
162 | 162
![]() |
|
164 | 164
![]() |
|
166 | 166
![]() |
|
168 | 168
![]() |
|
170 | 170
![]() |
|
172 | 172
![]() |
|
174 | 174
![]() |
|
176 | 176
![]() |