Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:21-ap-03111
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2021
Terminated:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cornerstone Revival Center
3151 AL Hwy 69 N
Cullman, AL 35058
Represented By
Cornerstone Revival Center
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Robert S. Westermann
Hirschler Fleischer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
34 34 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 11/20 2:22 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 03/27 3:22 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)13 Amended Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
32 32 court Hearing continued Tue 03/26 1:38 PM
Hearing continued per agenda filed in bankruptcy case 15-32919 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 4/25/2024 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Cummings, James)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,17 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
31 31 court Hearing continued Tue 02/20 2:34 PM
Hearing continued per amended agenda filed in bankruptcy case 15-32919 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 3/26/2024 at 01:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Cummings, James)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, January 22, 2024
30 30 court Hearing continued Mon 01/22 2:52 PM
Hearing continued per agenda filed in bankruptcy case 15-32919 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 2/20/2024 at 01:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Cummings, James) Modified on 1/22/2024 to edit docket text (Cummings, James)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, December 21, 2023
29 29 court Hearing continued Thu 12/21 3:42 PM
Hearing continued per agenda filed in bankruptcy case 15-32919 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 1/23/2024 at 01:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Cummings, James)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,17 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, December 04, 2023
28 28 court Entry Modification Made: See entry Mon 12/04 4:26 PM
Entry Modification Made to edit text: See entry Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s) 27 Hearing Cancelled
27 27 court Hearing Cancelled Mon 12/04 4:15 PM
Hearing Cancelled; Hearings rescheduled from December 5, 2023, to December 21, 2023 at 1:30 PM per Amended Notice of Hearing #26 Related [+] (LisaGary) Modified on 12/4/2023 to edit text (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,17 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
26 26 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 12/04 3:35 PM
Amended Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Cornerstone Revival Center. Hearing scheduled for 12/21/2023 at 01:30 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,17 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,21 Response to Motion/Application filed by Cornerstone Revival Center,25 Reply to Motion/Application filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
25 25 answer Reply Tue 11/28 3:15 PM
Reply to Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
24 24 misc Affidavit Tue 11/21 12:53 PM
Affidavit of Robert Bradford Johnson Related [+] filed by Kevin J. Funk of Durrette, Arkema, Gerson & Gill PC on behalf of Cornerstone Revival Center. (Funk, Kevin)
Related: [-] related document(s)21 Response to Motion/Application filed by Cornerstone Revival Center
23 23 misc Affidavit Tue 11/21 12:50 PM
Affidavit of Jeremy Wilbanks Related [+] filed by Kevin J. Funk of Durrette, Arkema, Gerson & Gill PC on behalf of Cornerstone Revival Center.(Funk, Kevin)
Related: [-] related document(s)21 Response to Motion/Application filed by Cornerstone Revival Center
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
22 22 misc Affidavit Tue 11/21 12:47 PM
Affidavit of Charlotte Denney Related [+] filed by Kevin J. Funk of Durrette, Arkema, Gerson & Gill PC on behalf of Cornerstone Revival Center. (Funk, Kevin)
Related: [-] related document(s)21 Response to Motion/Application filed by Cornerstone Revival Center
21 21 answer Response Tue 11/21 12:44 PM
Defendant's Response to Related [+] filed by Kevin J. Funk of Durrette, Arkema, Gerson & Gill PC on behalf of Cornerstone Revival Center. (Funk, Kevin)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing Wed 11/15 4:49 PM
Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/5/2023 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)17 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
19 19 notice Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing Wed 11/15 4:48 PM
Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/5/2023 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
18 18 motion Sealed Document Tue 11/07 9:24 PM
Sealed Exhibit Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] ument(s)17 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
17 17 motion Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal Tue 11/07 9:23 PM
Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal Motion for Authority to File Under Seal Exhibits to Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Summary Judgment and Opening Memorandum in Support Thereof Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] ument(s)16 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
16 16 motion Summary Judgment Tue 11/07 9:22 PM
Motion for Summary Judgment Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Summary Judgment and Opening Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
15 15 order Stipulation and Order Fri 10/27 5:01 PM
Stipulation and Agreed Order Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Pre-Trial Order
Thursday, May 18, 2023
14 14 misc Stipulation Thu 05/18 3:56 PM
Stipulation Regarding Answer and Additional Defenses By Cornerstone Revival Center and Between Richard Arrowsmith, Trustee filed by Kevin J. Funk of Durrette, Arkema, Gerson & Gill PC on behalf of Cornerstone Revival Center. (Funk, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 05/04 1:10 PM
Amended Complaint against Cornerstone Revival Center Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
12 12 misc Stipulation Thu 05/04 1:08 PM
Stipulation By Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee and Between Defendant Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Sunday, April 16, 2023
11 11 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Mon 04/17 12:11 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Pre-Trial Order
Friday, April 14, 2023
10 10 order Pre-Trial Order Fri 04/14 12:28 PM
Pre-Trial Discovery Scheduling Order; Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
9 9 court Pre-Trial Conference Held Tue 02/21 11:55 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Held; Consent Pre-Trial Order to be submitted as set out out in open court; Appearance(s): Brittany Falabella for Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, February 17, 2023
8 8 misc Statement Fri 02/17 3:48 PM
Statement Notice of Agreed Proposed Pretrial Discovery Scheduling Order Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Notice of Hearing filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 01/24 3:35 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Pre-Trial Scheduling Conference Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 2/21/2023 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
6 6 misc Mediator Certification of Compliance Wed 01/18 10:27 AM
Mediator Certification of Compliance filed by Peter M. Pearl of Spilman Thomas & Battle PLLC on behalf of Peter M. Pearl, Mediator. (Pearl, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
5 5 answer None Thu 12/16 3:28 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Kevin J. Funk of Durrette, Arkema, Gerson & Gill PC on behalf of Cornerstone Revival Center. (Funk, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/16 1:38 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Monday, November 15, 2021
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Mon 11/15 4:09 PM
Summons and notice issued to Cornerstone Revival Center Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 11/10 3:02 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 21-03111 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 33983099, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 11/10 3:01 PM
Adversary case 21-03111 Complaint against Cornerstone Revival Center filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-]