Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Gallagher
Case #: 5:21-cv-04988
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Nov 11, 2021
Terminated:Nov 02, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday May 10, 2022 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
United Equitable Mortgage Corporation
5495 Belt Line Rd #200
Dallas, TX 75254
Represented By
SEAN W. LOGSDON
Donald G. Karpowich, Attorney At Law, P.C.
contact info
Dirk Stephan Berger
Dirk Berger, Esquire
contact info
Plaintiff
Zdzislaw Fortuniak
68 Delray Lane
Absecon, NJ 08201
Represented By
SEAN P. MAYS
The Mays Law Firm PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Margaret Kostrzewski
68 Delray Lane
Absecon, NJ 08201
Represented By
SEAN P. MAYS
The Mays Law Firm PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
15 15 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Wed 11/02 9:10 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b), PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES, WITHOUT COSTS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 11/2/22. 11/2/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
14 14 notice Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing Wed 10/19 2:24 PM
NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing - Arbitration, scheduled for 10/21/2022(sah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
13 13 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Arbitration Tue 09/13 11:30 AM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION IS HEREWITH REFERRED TO ARBITRATION. THE FOLLOWING CERTIFIED ARBITRATORS HAVE BEEN RANDOMLY SELECTED TO HEAR THIS CASE: CHAIRPERSON: JOHN C. GORMLEY, ESQ.; ARBITRATOR: STEVE HOFFMAN, ESQ.; ARBITRATOR: WILLIAM K. MALKAMES, ESQ. THE ARBITRATION HEARING WILL BE HELD ON 10/21/22, AT 9:30 AM, IN ALLENTOWN, PA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 9/13/22. 9/13/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 06/13 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 10/21/2022 09:30 AM IN Allentown, Courtroom A, 4th Floor.(sah)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
11 11 adr Notice Re: Arbitration Declination of Videoconference Fri 05/27 11:46 AM
Notice Re: Arbitration Declination of Videoconference(LOGSDON, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
10 10 adr Notice Re: Arbitration Videoconference Wed 05/18 9:18 AM
Notice Re: Arbitration Videoconference(mcos, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent
Friday, April 22, 2022
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/22 3:30 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by United Equitable Mortgage Corporation.(LOGSDON, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
8 8 1 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Tue 03/08 4:21 PM
ORDER OF 3/8/22 THAT THE DEADLINE FOR FILING DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO APRIL 23, 2022. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 3/8/22. 3/8/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation Tue 03/08 3:04 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Time with Proposed Order by United Equitable Mortgage Corporation.(LOGSDON, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order- Joint Stipulation
6 6 misc Stipulation Tue 03/08 1:16 PM
STIPULATION by United Equitable Mortgage Corporation.(LOGSDON, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, February 28, 2022
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/28 2:17 PM
Notice of 2/28/22 from Judge Gallagher's Chambers. RE: No Responsive Pleading on Docket. (DT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 24, 2022
4 4 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 02/24 9:18 AM
ORDER OF 2/23/22 THAT THE APPLICATION OF SEAN W. LOGSDON, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 2/23/22. 2/24/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 02/23 9:58 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15742487.) filed by United Equitable Mortgage Corporation.Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.(Berger, Dirk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
2 2 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/08 3:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret Kostrzewski, Zdzislaw Fortuniak re: Seagull Legal Services, Inc. served Summons and Complaint upon United Equitable Mortgage Corporation by personal. United Equitable Mortgage Corporation served on 2/2/2022, answer due 2/23/2022. (MAYS, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
service Summons Issued Fri 11/12 12:04 PM
Summons Issued as to United Equitable Mortgage Corporation. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 11/12/21 (bw, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 11, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Thu 11/11 10:42 PM
COMPLAINT against United Equitable Mortgage Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15543728.), filed by Margaret Kostrzewski, Zdzislaw Fortuniak.(MAYS, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B
misc Jury Demand Fri 11/12 9:13 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Zdzislaw Fortuniak, Margaret Kostrzewski. (JL )
Related: [-]