California Southern District Court
Case #: 2:21-mj-08906
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2021
Terminated:Dec 10, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 12:32 PM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Blanca Quintero
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ramiro Xavier Gaxiola-Garcia (1)
Terminated: 12/10/2021
Represented By
Douglas C. Brown
Law Offices Of Douglas C. Brown
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/29/2024 12:23 PM PDT
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
Arrest of Ramiro Xavier Gaxiola-Garcia (no document attached) (vyc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Ramiro Xavier Gaxiola-Garcia. (Copies provided to Counsel in Court). Initial Appearance set for 11/10/2021 in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/23/2021 09:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Arraignment set for 12/7/2021 09:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro.(vyc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 info sheet
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro: Initial Appearance as to Ramiro Xavier Gaxiola-Garcia held on 11/10/2021. Appointed Attorney Douglas C. Brown for Ramiro Xavier Gaxiola-Garcia. Bond set as to Ramiro Xavier Gaxiola-Garcia (1) No Bail. Government oral motion for detention due to risk of flight. Detention Hearing - RF set for 11/15/2021 09:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/23/2021 at 09:00am in El Centro before Magistrate Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Arraignment set for 12/07/2021 at 09:00am in El Centro before Magistrate Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Defendant consents to proceed via VTC. Attorney Douglas C. Brown for Ramiro Xavier Gaxiola-Garcia provisionally appointed. Written advisement of Due Process Protection Act. Proffer regarding defendant's financial ability to retain an attorney. As required by Rule 5(f), the US is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings.(CD# 11/10/2021 RBM 21 1:54-1:58). (Plaintiff Attorney Courtney Strange). (Defendant Attorney James Johnson). (vyc)
Related: [-]
3 3 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Ramiro Xavier Gaxiola-Garcia (no document attached) (vyc)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORAL MOTION to Detain by USA as to Ramiro Xavier Gaxiola-Garcia. (no document attached) (vyc)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER as to Ramiro Xavier Gaxiola-Garcia: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 11/10/2021. (vyc)
Related: [-]