Illinois Central District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-10039
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2021
Last checked: Friday Nov 12, 2021 1:36 AM CST
Defendant
Richard Sabbun (1)
Represented By
Mark Douglas Johnson
Johnson Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Douglas F McMeyer
Us Atty
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/12/2021 2:02 AM CST
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Richard Sabbun: Initial Appearance set for 10/25/2021 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom C in Peoria before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. (AH)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs INDICTMENT as to Richard Sabbun (1) count(s) 1-15. (AH)
Related: [-]
2 2 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL DOCUMENT UNREDACTED INDICTMENT (AH)
Related: [-]
3 3 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET. (AH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
TEXT ORDER as to Richard Sabbun: Initial Appearance/Arraignment set for 10/25/21 is CHANGED ti 10/28/2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C in Peoria before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Dft having been served and Dft attorney notified and agreeing to the change in hearing date, no additional summons is ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/13/21. (WG)
Related: [-]