Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Henry Edward Autrey
Case #: 4:21-cv-01343
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause12:2615 Contracts
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2021
Terminated:Jan 09, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday May 11, 2022 3:57 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Share A Splash Wine Co., LLC
Represented By
Paul V. Herbers
Cooling And Herbers
contact info
Leo W. Nelsen, Jr.
Nelsen And Lee PC
contact info
Paul B. Lee
Nelsen And Lee PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Pinnacle Imports, LLC
1439 Lanvale Dr.
Webster Groves, MO 63119
Represented By
Sara Robertson
Polsinelli Pc - St Louis
contact info
Jon A. Bierman
Polsinelli Pc - St Louis
contact info
Defendant
Share A Splash Wine Co., LLC
Represented By
Paul V. Herbers
Cooling And Herbers
contact info
Leo W. Nelsen, Jr.
Nelsen And Lee PC
contact info
Paul B. Lee
Nelsen And Lee PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Pinnacle Imports, LLC
1681 Walton Road
Overland, MO 63114
Represented By
Sara Robertson
Polsinelli Pc - St Louis
contact info
Jon A. Bierman
Polsinelli Pc - St Louis
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
130 130 appeal USCA Judgment Thu 05/08 10:24 AM
USCA JUDGMENT as to118 Notice of Appeal filed by Pinnacle Imports, LLC. This appeal from the United States District Court was submitted on the record of the district court, briefs of the parties and was argued by counsel. After consideration, it is hereby ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the district court in this cause is reversed and the cause is remanded to the district court for proceedings consistent with the opinion of this court. This is a preliminary judgment and/or opinion of U.S. Court of Appeals; jurisdiction is not recovered until the Mandate is issued by the U.S Court of Appeals. (CLH)
Related: [-]
129 129 6 pgs appeal Opinion from USCA Thu 05/08 10:22 AM
OPINION from USCA re118 Notice of Appeal : USCA Appeal #: 24-1192 Reversed and Remanded (CLH)
Related: [-]