California Central District Court
Judge:Fred W Slaughter
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:21-cv-08935
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2021
Terminated:Mar 21, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday May 11, 2022 1:36 AM PDT
Defendant
Nourafshan Venice Properties, LLC
Represented By
Vanessa Lynn Vinje
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Barry J Reagan
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
R and LS Investments Inc
Represented By
Nicholas Max Meerson
Manning And Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ilana Yamtoobian
Represented By
Vanessa Lynn Vinje
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Barry J Reagan
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
Urban Developer LLC
Represented By
Vanessa Lynn Vinje
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Barry J Reagan
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
Urban Blox LLC
Represented By
Vanessa Lynn Vinje
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Barry J Reagan
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
Urban Blox Criminal Enterprise
Represented By
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
Thornton Property One LLC
Represented By
Vanessa Lynn Vinje
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
Surf Realty Corporation
Represented By
Marc S Shapiro
Hanger Steinberg Shapiro And Ash Alc
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Kristina M Parido
Hanger Steinberg Shapiro Ash Alc
contact info
Defendant
Stepp Commercial
Represented By
Fredric W. Trester
Manning And Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Nicholas Max Meerson
Manning And Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Ari L Markow
Manning And Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kimberly Roberts Stepp
Represented By
Fredric W. Trester
Manning And Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Nicholas Max Meerson
Manning And Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Ari L Markow
Manning And Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
Raffi Shirinian
Represented By
Vanessa Lynn Vinje
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
S Bonita One, LLC
Represented By
Vanessa Lynn Vinje
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Barry J Reagan
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
RIF Investments-2, LLC
Represented By
Lisa Noel Shyer
Procter Shyer And Winter LLP
contact info
Vanessa Lynn Vinje
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
Terry Polesie
Represented By
Marc S Shapiro
Hanger Steinberg Shapiro And Ash Alc
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Kristina M Parido
Hanger Steinberg Shapiro Ash Alc
contact info
Defendant
David Nourafshan
Represented By
Lisa Noel Shyer
Procter Shyer And Winter LLP
contact info
Vanessa Lynn Vinje
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
Law Offices of Joseph Miskabi
Represented By
Kenneth Charles Feldman
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith LLP
contact info
Patrik Johansson
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
27 Ozone, LLC
Represented By
Vanessa Lynn Vinje
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Barry J Reagan
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
351 SB Two LLC
Represented By
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
Central Realty Advisors, Inc.
Represented By
Colette Rose Magnetta
Acker And Whipple
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Stephen Acker
Acker And Whipple Apc
contact info
Defendant
Kathy Cook
Represented By
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Represented By
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
David Duel
Represented By
Vanessa Lynn Vinje
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Barry J Reagan
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rebecca Duel
Represented By
Vanessa Lynn Vinje
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Barry J Reagan
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
Forward Management Long Beach, Inc.
Represented By
Courtney Elise Arnold
Zelms Erlich And Mack
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Rinat Klier-Erlich
Zelms Erlich And Mack
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Getz
Represented By
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
Iy Ek Partners, LLC
Represented By
Vanessa Lynn Vinje
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Barry J Reagan
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Miskabi
Represented By
Kenneth Charles Feldman
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith LLP
contact info
Patrik Johansson
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Rosen
Represented By
Michael E Schwimer
Schwimer Weinstein LLP
contact info
Mitchell Rosensweig
Schwimer Weinstein LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
R and SL Investments, Inc.
Terminated: 03/07/2022
Represented By
Fredric W. Trester
Manning And Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Ari L Markow
Manning And Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
Richard Daggenhurst
Terminated: 04/01/2022
Represented By
Vikram Sohal
Nemecek And Cole
contact info
Michael McCarthy
Nemeck And Cole Apc
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
Daggenhurst Law PC
Terminated: 04/01/2022
Represented By
Vikram Sohal
Nemecek And Cole
contact info
Michael McCarthy
Nemeck And Cole Apc
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info
Defendant
Felman Daggenhurst and El Dabe
Terminated: 04/01/2022
Represented By
Vikram Sohal
Nemecek And Cole
contact info
Michael McCarthy
Nemeck And Cole Apc
contact info
Jonathan D Marshall
Slaughter Reagan And Cole LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, July 28, 2023
114 114 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/28 10:00 AM
Notice of Filing Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay filed by Defendant R and LS Investments Inc.(Markow, Ari)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A