New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:21-cr-00807
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 08, 2024 10:51 AM EDT
Defendant
CARMELO G. GARCIA (1)
Represented By
TIMOTHY RICHARD SMITH
Caruso Pope Smith Edell Picini, PC
contact info
ROBERT G. STAHL
Stahl/gasiorowski, PC
contact info
Defendant
IRWIN SABLOSKY (3)
Represented By
KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Marino Tortorella & Boyle, PC
contact info
JOHN D. TORTORELLA
Marino, Tortorella & Boyle, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
FRANK VALVANO, JR. (2)
Represented By
JOHN J. O'REILLY
Mcelroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter LLP
contact info
Notice Only
DONALD L. MARTENZ, JR.
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
ELAINE K. LOU
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info
JEFFREY JOSEPH MANIS
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info
EDELI RIVERA
Doj-Usao
contact info
BARBARA WARD
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info
JIHEE GILLIAN SUH
Office Of The Us Attorney
contact info
ARI BRETT FONTECCHIO
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info
KATHERINE CALLE
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 6:24 AM EDT
Thursday, November 19, 2020
1 1 12 pgs COMPLAINT as to CARMELO G. GARCIA (1), FRANK VALVANO, JR. (2), IRWIN SABLOSKY (3). (jbb) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: JOHN J. O'REILLY appearing for FRANK VALVANO, JR. (O'REILLY, JOHN) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: TIMOTHY RICHARD SMITH appearing for CARMELO G. GARCIA (SMITH, TIMOTHY) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2020
Arrest of CARMELO G. GARCIA, FRANK VALVANO, JR., IRWIN SABLOSKY (tjg, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE JEFFREY JOSEPH MANIS appearing for USA. (MANIS, JEFFREY) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor:Initial Appearance as to CARMELO G. GARCIA held on 11/24/2020 (Court Reporter/Recorder Zoom Cloud.) (tjg, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
9 9 Brady ORDER as to CARMELO G. GARCIA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/24/20. (tjg, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to CARMELO G. GARCIA (1) 100,000.00 UNSECURED (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/24/20. (tjg, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
11 11 UNSECURED Bond Entered as to CARMELO G. GARCIA in amount of $ 100,000.00, (tjg, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor:Initial Appearance as to FRANK VALVANO, JR. held on 11/24/2020 (Court Reporter/Recorder Zoom Cloud.) (tjg, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
13 13 Brady ORDER as to FRANK VALVANO, JR.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/24/20. (tjg, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to FRANK VALVANO, JR. (2) 100,000.00 UNSECURED (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/24/20. (tjg, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
15 15 UNSECURED Bond Entered as to FRANK VALVANO, JR. in amount of $ 100,000.00, (tjg, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor:Initial Appearance as to IRWIN SABLOSKY held on 11/24/2020 (Court Reporter/Recorder Zoom Cloud.) (tjg, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
17 17 Brady ORDER as to IRWIN SABLOSKY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/24/20. (tjg, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to IRWIN SABLOSKY (3) 100,000.00 UNSECURED (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/24/20. (tjg, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
19 19 UNSECURED Bond Entered as to IRWIN SABLOSKY in amount of $ 100,000.00, (tjg, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to FRANK VALVANO, JR.: Time excluded from 11/24/20 until 1/31/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/24/20. (jbb) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to IRWIN SABLOSKY: Time excluded from 11/24/20 until 1/31/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/24/20. (jbb) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
22 22 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to CARMELO G. GARCIA: Time excluded from 11/25/20 until 1/31/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/25/20. (jbb) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
23 23 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: KEVIN HARRY MARINO appearing for IRWIN SABLOSKY (MARINO, KEVIN) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
24 24 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: JOHN D. TORTORELLA appearing for IRWIN SABLOSKY (TORTORELLA, JOHN) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
25 25 THIRD EXTENSION OF STANDING ORDER 20-12 (COVID-19) excluding Speedy Trial time, under 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A), from March 16, 2020 through March 12, 2021 in all criminal proceedings in this District under the Speedy Trial Act, including those proceedings commenced by complaint and time limits established by the Interstate Agreement of Detainers, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/17/20. (jbb) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
26 26 LETTER ORDER as to CARMELO G. GARCIA, FRANK VALVANO, JR., IRWIN SABLOSKY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/19/21. (jbb) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
27 27 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to IRWIN SABLOSKY: Time excluded from 1/21/21 until 3/12/21. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 1/21/21. (LM, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
28 28 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to CARMELO G. GARCIA: Time excluded from 1/22/21 until 3/12/21. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 1/22/21. (LM, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
29 29 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to FRANK VALVANO, JR.: Time excluded from 2/3/21 until 3/12/21. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 2/3/21. (LM, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
32 32 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to IRWIN SABLOSKY Time excluded from 3/9/21 until 6/7/21. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 3/9/21. (LM, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
33 33 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to FRANK VALVANO, JR. Time excluded from 3/9/21 until 6/7/21. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 3/9/21. (LM, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
30 30 FOURTH EXTENSION OF STANDING ORDER 20-12 (COVID-19) excluding Speedy Trial time, under 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A), from March 16, 2020 through June 1, 2021 in all criminal proceedings in this District under the Speedy Trial Act, including those proceedings commenced by complaint and time limits established by the Interstate Agreement of Detainers, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/11/21. (jbb) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
31 31 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to CARMELO G. GARCIA Time excluded from 3/8/21 until 6/7/21. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 3/8/21. (LM, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
Case as to CARMELO G. GARCIA, FRANK VALVANO, JR., IRWIN SABLOSKY Reassigned to Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson no longer assigned to the case. (ak, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 14, 2021
34 34 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Mark Falk, U.S.M.J. submitting proposed Consent Order permitting travel(MARINO, KEVIN) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, May 17, 2021
35 35 2 pgs ORDER modifying conditions of release as to IRWIN SABLOSKY (travel). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/17/21. (tjg, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
36 36 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to FRANK VALVANO, JR.: Time excluded from 6/2/21 until 8/16/21. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 6/2/21. (LM, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 03, 2021
37 37 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to CARMELO G. GARCIA: Time excluded from 6/3/21 until 8/16/21. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 6/3/21. (LM, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
38 38 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to IRWIN SABLOSKY: Time excluded from 6/7/21 until 8/16/21. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 6/7/21. (LM, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
39 39 Letter (SMITH, TIMOTHY) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
40 40 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to CARMELO G. GARCIA: Time excluded from 7/20/21 until 9/30/21. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 7/20/21. (LM, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 23, 2021
41 41 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to IRWIN SABLOSKY: Time excluded from 7/23/21 until 9/30/21. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 7/23/21. (LM, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
42 42 2 pgs ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to FRANK VALVANO, JR.: Time excluded from 7/23/21 until 9/30/21. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 7/23/21. (LM, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
43 43 ORDER modifying conditions of release as to CARMELO G. GARCIA (travel). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/23/21. (tjg, ) [2:20-mj-08481-MF]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
Notice of Allocation and Assignment as to CARMELO G. GARCIA, FRANK VALVANO, JR., IRWIN SABLOSKY (Newark - Judge John Michael Vazquez). (dc, )
Related: [-]
44 44 33 pgs INDICTMENT as to CARMELO G. GARCIA (1) count(s) 1, 2-18, 19-22, 23-25, FRANK VALVANO, JR. (2) count(s) 1, 2-18, 19-22, 26-28, IRWIN SABLOSKY (3) count(s) 1, 2-18, 19-22, 26-28. (dc, )
Related: [-]