California Northern District Court
Judge:Joseph C Spero
Case #: 3:21-cv-08854
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2021
Terminated:May 26, 2023
Last checked: Saturday May 14, 2022 3:11 AM PDT
Defendant
Daniel Ager
Represented By
Richard William Osman
Bertrand, Fox, Elliot, Osman & Wenzel
contact info
Asha Jameson
Bertrand, Fox, Elliot, Osman & Wenzel
contact info
Defendant
Olivia Longstaff
Represented By
Richard S. Diestel
Bledsoe, Diestel, Treppa & Crane LLP
contact info
Defendant
Chistopher Rhodes
Represented By
Richard S. Diestel
Bledsoe, Diestel, Treppa & Crane LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Ricks
Represented By
Richard William Osman
Bertrand, Fox, Elliot, Osman & Wenzel
contact info
Asha Jameson
Bertrand, Fox, Elliot, Osman & Wenzel
contact info
Defendant
Sonoma County
Represented By
Richard William Osman
Bertrand, Fox, Elliot, Osman & Wenzel
contact info
Asha Jameson
Bertrand, Fox, Elliot, Osman & Wenzel
contact info
Defendant
Westminster Woods
Represented By
Richard S. Diestel
Bledsoe, Diestel, Treppa & Crane LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Emma Borhanian
Represented By
Randall L Kallinen
Kallinen Law PLLC
contact info
Jerold D Friedman
Law Office Of Jerold D. Friedman
contact info
Plaintiff
Gwen Danielson
Represented By
Randall L Kallinen
Kallinen Law PLLC
contact info
Jerold D Friedman
Law Office Of Jerold D. Friedman
contact info
Plaintiff
Jack LaSota
Represented By
Randall L Kallinen
Kallinen Law PLLC
contact info
Jerold D Friedman
Law Office Of Jerold D. Friedman
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexander Leatham
Represented By
Randall L Kallinen
Kallinen Law PLLC
contact info
Jerold D Friedman
Law Office Of Jerold D. Friedman
contact info

GPO Apr 19 2022
f criminal charges, and by 8/12/2022. Status Conference set for 8/19/2022 at 2:00 PM. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2022)ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 27 Motion to Stay; denying without prejudice 23 Motion to Dismiss; and vacating hearing and case management conference. Status Report due no later than 21 days after the resolution o
GPO May 01 2023
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/1/2023. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/26/2023 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Mr. Friedman shall serve a copy of this Order on the Plaintiffs and file a certificate of service.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 26, 2023
62 62 minutes Show Cause Hearing Fri 05/26 3:25 PM
Minute Entry for ZOOM proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Show Cause Hearing held on 5/26/2023. This case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Court to issue order. Digital Recording Time: Not Reported. Total Time: 2 M. Plaintiff Attorney: No Appearance. Defendant Attorney: Alison Crane for Westminster Woods, Rhodes & Longstaff; Richard Osman for Sonoma County, Ager & Ricks (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/26/2023)
Related: [-]
61 61 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/26 3:14 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 26, 2023. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]