Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-02568
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2021
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Sunday May 15, 2022 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JOSE ORTIZ
Represented By
FREDERICK THURMAN KUYKENDALL, III
The Kuykendall Law Group Llc - Fairhope Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, May 06, 2022
4 4 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Sat 05/14 1:25 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 11/16 8:05 AM
NOTICE Notice of Designated Forum - United States District Court, District of Delaware by JOSE ORTIZ re1 Complaint (KUYKENDALL, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/16 8:04 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KUYKENDALL, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/16 8:02 AM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6546123.), filed by JOSE ORTIZ. (KUYKENDALL, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]