Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Younge
Case #: 2:21-cv-05041
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2021
Terminated:Aug 03, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 15, 2022 5:56 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
LENNAR MPA, LLC
Represented By
KEVIN W. BURDETT
Braverman Kaskey PC
contact info
BENJAMIN A. GARBER
Braveman Kasky PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
LENNAR MPA WIP, LLC
Represented By
KEVIN W. BURDETT
Braverman Kaskey PC
contact info
BENJAMIN A. GARBER
Braveman Kasky PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
CALATLANTIC TITLE, INC.
Represented By
STEPHEN G. RHOADS
Macmain, Connell & Leinhauser, LLC
contact info
KELLY KATHLEEN HUFF
Montgomery Mccracken Walker & Rhoads LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
BENSALEM REDEVELOPMENT, LP
Represented By
ROBERT R. WATSON, JR.
Eastburn & Gray PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
WATERSIDE PHASE 1, LLC
Represented By
ROBERT R. WATSON, JR.
Eastburn & Gray PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
MEI-EDGEWATER, LP
Represented By
ROBERT R. WATSON, JR.
Eastburn & Gray PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
MEI-BERKLEY PLACE, LP
Represented By
ROBERT R. WATSON, JR.
Eastburn & Gray PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
FORTUNA STATION DEVELOPMENT, LP
Represented By
ROBERT R. WATSON, JR.
Eastburn & Gray PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
BARNEGAT HILLS ASSOCIATES, LP
Represented By
ROBERT R. WATSON, JR.
Eastburn & Gray PC
contact info
Cross Claimant
CALATLANTIC TITLE, INC.
Represented By
STEPHEN G. RHOADS
Macmain, Connell & Leinhauser, LLC
contact info
KELLY KATHLEEN HUFF
Montgomery Mccracken Walker & Rhoads LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
LENNAR MPA WIP, LLC
Represented By
KEVIN W. BURDETT
Braverman Kaskey PC
contact info
BENJAMIN A. GARBER
Braveman Kasky PC
contact info
Cross Defendant
LENNAR MPA, LLC
Represented By
KEVIN W. BURDETT
Braverman Kaskey PC
contact info
BENJAMIN A. GARBER
Braveman Kasky PC
contact info
Defendant
LENNAR MPA, LLC
Represented By
KEVIN W. BURDETT
Braverman Kaskey PC
contact info
BENJAMIN A. GARBER
Braveman Kasky PC
contact info
Defendant
LENNAR MPA WIP, LLC
Represented By
KEVIN W. BURDETT
Braverman Kaskey PC
contact info
BENJAMIN A. GARBER
Braveman Kasky PC
contact info
Plaintiff
WATERSIDE PHASE 1, LLC
Represented By
ROBERT R. WATSON, JR.
Eastburn & Gray PC
contact info
Plaintiff
BARNEGAT HILLS ASSOCIATES, LP
Represented By
ROBERT R. WATSON, JR.
Eastburn & Gray PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MEI-EDGEWATER, LP
Represented By
ROBERT R. WATSON, JR.
Eastburn & Gray PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MEI-BERKLEY PLACE, LP
Represented By
ROBERT R. WATSON, JR.
Eastburn & Gray PC
contact info
Plaintiff
FORTUNA STATION DEVELOPMENT, LP
Represented By
ROBERT R. WATSON, JR.
Eastburn & Gray PC
contact info
Plaintiff
BENSALEM REDEVELOPMENT, LP
Represented By
ROBERT R. WATSON, JR.
Eastburn & Gray PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CALATLANTIC TITLE, INC.
Terminated: 03/30/2022
Represented By
STEPHEN G. RHOADS
Macmain, Connell & Leinhauser, LLC
contact info
KELLY KATHLEEN HUFF
Montgomery Mccracken Walker & Rhoads LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, August 03, 2023
47 47 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 08/03 10:48 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice filed jointly by LENNAR MPA WIP, LLC, LENNAR MPA WIP, LLC, LENNAR MPA, LLC, LENNAR MPA, LLC. (GARBER, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
46 46 minutes Settlement Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 08/01 12:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS Settlement Conference held on 7/31/23. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
45 45 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 06/16 10:53 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS VIDEO Settlement Conference held on 6/16/23. (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
44 44 minutes Settlement Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 06/02 7:21 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS Settlement Conference held on 5/30/23. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
43 43 misc Letter Fri 05/26 10:32 AM
Letter dated 5/26/2023 by CALATLANTIC TITLE, INC.. (HENRY, DYLAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
42 42 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/11 9:33 AM
ORDER THAT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/30/2023 02:00 PM IN Judge's Chambers. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 5/11/23. 5/11/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
41 41 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Thu 04/13 11:50 AM
ORDER denying24 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; denying without prejudice39 MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 4/13/23.4/13/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
40 40 minutes Motion Hearing 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 03/30 1:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE Motion Hearing held on 3/30/23 re24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FORTUNA STATION DEVELOPMENT, LP, BENSALEM REDEVELOPMENT, LP, MEI-EDGEWATER, LP, MEI-BERKLEY PLACE, LP, WATERSIDE PHASE 1, LLC, BARNEGAT HILLS ASSOCIATES, LP Court Reporter: ESR. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
39 39 motion Attorney Fees Wed 03/29 2:22 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by CALATLANTIC TITLE, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service.(HENRY, DYLAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
Monday, March 27, 2023
38 38 trial Proposed Findings of Fact Mon 03/27 1:38 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by BARNEGAT HILLS ASSOCIATES, LP, BENSALEM REDEVELOPMENT, LP, FORTUNA STATION DEVELOPMENT, LP, MEI-BERKLEY PLACE, LP, MEI-EDGEWATER, LP, WATERSIDE PHASE 1, LLC. Certificate of Service (WATSON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
37 37 trial Proposed Findings of Fact Mon 03/27 1:13 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by LENNAR MPA WIP, LLC, LENNAR MPA WIP, LLC, LENNAR MPA, LLC, LENNAR MPA, LLC. (GARBER, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
36 36 minutes Settlement Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 02/23 8:47 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS Settlement Conference held on 2/22/23. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
35 35 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/07 2:19 PM
ORDER THAT MOTION HEARING SET FOR 3/30/2023 10:00 AM IN Courtroom 15B. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 2/7/23. 2/7/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
34 34 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 02/07 2:15 PM
ORDER THAT MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 7/24/2023; TRIAL DATE SET FOR 8/14/2023 09:30 AM IN Courtroom 15B. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 2/7/23. 2/7/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
33 33 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 02/07 2:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE Pretrial Conference held on 2/7/23. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
32 32 misc Pretrial Memorandum Tue 01/31 5:28 PM
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by LENNAR MPA WIP, LLC, LENNAR MPA WIP, LLC, LENNAR MPA, LLC, LENNAR MPA, LLC. (BURDETT, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Pretrial Memorandum Tue 01/31 3:42 PM
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by BARNEGAT HILLS ASSOCIATES, LP, BENSALEM REDEVELOPMENT, LP, FORTUNA STATION DEVELOPMENT, LP, MEI-BERKLEY PLACE, LP, MEI-EDGEWATER, LP, WATERSIDE PHASE 1, LLC Certificate of service. (WATSON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
30 30 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 01/13 9:42 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS VIDEO Settlement Conference held on 1/12/23. (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
29 29 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/01 1:00 PM
ORDER THAT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/12/2023 02:00 PM IN Video Conference. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 12/1/22. 12/1/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
28 28 misc Statement Wed 11/16 12:09 PM
Statement Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Statement of Additional Disputed Material Facts by BARNEGAT HILLS ASSOCIATES, LP, BENSALEM REDEVELOPMENT, LP, FORTUNA STATION DEVELOPMENT, LP, MEI-BERKLEY PLACE, LP, MEI-EDGEWATER, LP, WATERSIDE PHASE 1, LLC. (WATSON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
27 27 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Wed 11/09 11:51 AM
ORDER THAT THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 11/9/22. 11/9/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
26 26 misc Praecipe/Request Tue 11/08 3:54 PM
Praecipe to Attach Exhibits to Lennar MPA, LLC and Lennar MPA, WIP, LLC Responsive Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 25] by LENNAR MPA WIP, LLC, LENNAR MPA, LLC.(BURDETT, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26,
Att: 27 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 07, 2022
25 25 28 pgs respm Memorandum Mon 11/07 6:22 PM
Memorandum of Law in Opposition re24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LENNAR MPA WIP, LLC, LENNAR MPA, LLC.(BURDETT, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Responsive Statement of Material Facts,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, October 07, 2022
24 24 motion Summary Judgment Fri 10/07 1:20 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BARNEGAT HILLS ASSOCIATES, LP, BENSALEM REDEVELOPMENT, LP, FORTUNA STATION DEVELOPMENT, LP, MEI-BERKLEY PLACE, LP, MEI-EDGEWATER, LP, WATERSIDE PHASE 1, LLC.Affidavit, Brief, Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, Certificate of Service.(WATSON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Affidavit Affidavit of Stephen McKenna,
Att: 23 Supplement Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts,
Att: 24 Brief Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 25 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
Monday, August 01, 2022
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 08/01 10:10 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL PRODUCE ALL RESPONSIVE DOCUMENTS IN THEIR POSSESSION AND CONTROL WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER OR RISK SANCTIONS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE DEADLINE FOR FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE EXTENDED UNTIL SEPTEMBER 7, 2022. ALL OTHER DATES AND DEADLINES IN THE SCHEDULING ORDER SHALL REMAIN THE SAME. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 8/1/22.8/1/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
22 22 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 07/21 9:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Plaintiffs filed by LENNAR MPA WIP, LLC, LENNAR MPA, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, and Certificate of Service.(GARBER, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certification of Counsel,
Att: 3 Memorandum,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3,
Att: 7 Exhibit 4,
Att: 8 Exhibit 5,
Att: 9 Exhibit 6,
Att: 10 Certificate of Service
Thursday, April 21, 2022
21 21 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 04/22 7:51 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT TIME FOR LENNAR PARTIES TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IS HEREBY EXTENDED THOUGH AND INCLUDING 5/2/22. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 4/21/22. 4/22/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/30 5:58 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Jointly agreed among Plaintiffs and Defendants of CalAtlantic Title, Inc. by BARNEGAT HILLS ASSOCIATES, LP, BENSALEM REDEVELOPMENT, LP, FORTUNA STATION DEVELOPMENT, LP, MEI-BERKLEY PLACE, LP, MEI-EDGEWATER, LP, WATERSIDE PHASE 1, LLC. (WATSON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
19 19 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/29 2:09 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/7/2023 11:00 AM IN Video Conference BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE. ALL FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 7/27/2022. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 10/7/2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 3/29/22. AT THE PARTIES REQUEST, THIS MATTER WILL BE REFERRED TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. REFERRAL REQUESTS SHALL BE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT VIA EMAIL TO CHAMBERS_YOUNGE@PAED.USCOURTS.GOV AND COPIED TO ALL COUNSEL. SUCH REQUESTS SHALL BE MADE AT THE EARLIEST POSSIBLE STAGE OF THE LITIGATION WHEN SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS WILL BE PRODUCTIVE. AS A GENERAL RULE, THE COURT WILL NOT EXTEND OR STAY THE FOREGOING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES PENDING THE CONDUCT OF SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. 3/29/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Tue 03/29 11:59 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE Pretrial/RULE 16 Conference held on 3/29/22. (JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
17 17 misc Report Of Tue 03/22 4:24 PM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting (Joint) by BARNEGAT HILLS ASSOCIATES, LP, BENSALEM REDEVELOPMENT, LP, FORTUNA STATION DEVELOPMENT, LP, MEI-BERKLEY PLACE, LP, MEI-EDGEWATER, LP, WATERSIDE PHASE 1, LLC. (WATSON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
16 16 answer Answer to Crossclaim Tue 03/15 11:46 AM
Supplemental ANSWER to9 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, by BARNEGAT HILLS ASSOCIATES, LP, BENSALEM REDEVELOPMENT, LP, FORTUNA STATION DEVELOPMENT, LP, MEI-BERKLEY PLACE, LP, MEI-EDGEWATER, LP, WATERSIDE PHASE 1, LLC.(WATSON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/14 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN W. BURDETT on behalf of LENNAR MPA WIP, LLC, LENNAR MPA WIP, LLC, LENNAR MPA, LLC, LENNAR MPA, LLC with Certificate of Service(BURDETT, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
14 14 answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 02/02 4:31 PM
ANSWER to10 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, with affirmative defenses by BARNEGAT HILLS ASSOCIATES, LP, BENSALEM REDEVELOPMENT, LP, FORTUNA STATION DEVELOPMENT, LP, MEI-BERKLEY PLACE, LP, MEI-EDGEWATER, LP, WATERSIDE PHASE 1, LLC.(WATSON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
13 13 answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 02/02 4:30 PM
ANSWER to9 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, with affirmative defenses by BARNEGAT HILLS ASSOCIATES, LP, BENSALEM REDEVELOPMENT, LP, FORTUNA STATION DEVELOPMENT, LP, MEI-BERKLEY PLACE, LP, MEI-EDGEWATER, LP, WATERSIDE PHASE 1, LLC.(WATSON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Disclosure Wed 02/02 1:25 PM
Disclosure with Certificate of Service by CALATLANTIC TITLE, INC..(HUFF, KELLY)
Related: [-]
11 11 discov Disclosure Wed 02/02 11:00 AM
Disclosure with certificate of service by BARNEGAT HILLS ASSOCIATES, LP, BENSALEM REDEVELOPMENT, LP, FORTUNA STATION DEVELOPMENT, LP, MEI-BERKLEY PLACE, LP, MEI-EDGEWATER, LP, WATERSIDE PHASE 1, LLC.(WATSON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 01/20 6:22 PM
ANSWER to Complaint together with to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims , COUNTERCLAIM against BARNEGAT HILLS ASSOCIATES, LP, BENSALEM REDEVELOPMENT, LP, FORTUNA STATION DEVELOPMENT, LP, MEI-BERKLEY PLACE, LP, MEI-EDGEWATER, LP, WATERSIDE PHASE 1, LLC by LENNAR MPA, LLC, LENNAR MPA WIP, LLC.(GARBER, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Counterclaim Thu 01/20 5:56 PM
Defendant Lennar Title, Inc., f/k/a Cal-Atlantic Title, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM for Rule 22 Interpleader against All Plaintiffs, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by CALATLANTIC TITLE, INC..(RHOADS, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/20 9:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY KATHLEEN HUFF on behalf of CALATLANTIC TITLE, INC. with Certificate of Service(HUFF, KELLY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
7 7 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/19 9:11 AM
ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/29/2022 11:00 AM IN Video Conference. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/19/22. 1/19/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
6 6 2 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 01/14 3:11 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT FOR CALATLANTIC TITLE INC. IS EXTENDED TO 1/20/22. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/14/22. 1/14/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 30, 2021
5 5 misc Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts) Thu 12/30 4:15 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint (Attorney),, to Extend Deadline to 1/20/2022 for Defendant CalAltantic Title, Inc. to Respond to Complaint by CALATLANTIC TITLE, INC.. (RHOADS, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/30 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN G. RHOADS on behalf of CALATLANTIC TITLE, INC. (RHOADS, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
3 3 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 12/21 9:55 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT LENMAR PARTIES HAVE UNTIL 1/20/22 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 12/21/21. 12/21/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
2 2 service Affidavit of Service Mon 12/06 2:40 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Rafael Perez re: served Summons and Complaint upon Shanna Vidal, Authorized Employee for Defendants' Legal Department by personal on 11/30/2021 (WATSON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 11/16 11:48 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15551520.), filed by BARNEGAT HILLS ASSOCIATES, LP, BENSALEM REDEVELOPMENT, LP, MEI-BERKLEY PLACE, LP, MEI-EDGEWATER, LP, WATERSIDE PHASE 1, LLC, FORTUNA STATION DEVELOPMENT, LP.(WATSON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 9,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 10
service Summons Issued Tue 11/16 3:39 PM
Summons Issued as to CALATLANTIC TITLE, INC., LENNAR MPA WIP, LLC, LENNAR MPA, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 11/16/21 (bw, )
Related: [-]