Seneca County v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-03748 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Nov 16, 2021 |
Case in other court: | New York Western, 6:21-cv-06672 |
Last checked: Sunday May 15, 2022 5:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C.
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
E I DuPont De Nemours Company Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Ciba Inc. 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seneca County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by BASF Corporation.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice between Plaintiffs and Tyco, Chemguard, ChemDesign, and Released Parties by Tyco Fire Products LP.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, The 3M Company, The 3M Company, 3M Company, The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co). List of cases for dismissal)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, November 17, 2021 | ||
7 | 7 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Western, 6:21-cv-06672, Seneca County v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-3748-RMG (sshe, ) | |
5 | 5
![]() Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 6:21-cv-06672. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, November 15, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Monday, November 08, 2021 | ||
ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/17/2021.] | ||
Thursday, November 04, 2021 | ||
Case Assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/17/2021.] | ||
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] .(TMK) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/17/2021.] | ||
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TMK) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/17/2021.] | ||
Wednesday, November 03, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, November 02, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |