Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-02733
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2021
Terminated:May 02, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday May 17, 2022 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
ANTIAPAS TALON HAWK
Represented By
GARY ANTHONY ANDERSON
Environmental Litigation Group Pc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 02, 2022
2 2 27 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/05 11:26 AM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A and Exhibit B are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets only, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/2/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/18 9:34 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6550841.), filed by ANTIAPAS TALON HAWK. (ANDERSON, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet