Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:21-cv-00866
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12117 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2021
Terminated:Jan 13, 2022
Last checked: Monday May 16, 2022 3:32 AM CDT
Defendant
O'Reilly's Automotive Inc.
Plaintiff
Jerome Elmer Graff
311 Lutie Street
Nashville, TN 37210


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, January 13, 2022
6 6 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/13 10:15 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Plaintiff Jerome Elmer Graff filed a pro se complaint against defendant O'Reilly's Automotive Inc. under the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990. (Doc. No.1 .) However, the court found that the complaint did not contain specific factual allegations necessary to support the plaintiff's claims. (Doc. No.5 .) The court therefore granted the plaintiff's application to proceed as a pauper and ordered him to submit an amended complaint. The plaintiff, however, has not responded to the court's order in any way. For these reasons. this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/13/2022. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ln)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
5 5 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 12/01 10:20 AM
ORDER: Because it appears that the plaintiff cannot pay the full civil filing fee in advance "without undue hardship," the application to proceed as a pauper (Doc. No.2 ) is GRANTED. To proceed in this matter, the plaintiff MUST submit an amended complaint that, at a minimum, puts the defendant on notice of the legal basis of each claim and includes factual allegations sufficient to demonstrate a plausible right to right to relief that rises above the speculative level. The Clerk SHALL mail the plaintiff a blank form complaint for employment discrimination (Pro Se 7). The amended complaint MUST be received by the court within 30 DAYS of the date this order is entered on the docket. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/30/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail along with a blank form complaint for employment discrimination (Pro Se 7).) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ln)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Thu 11/18 9:48 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Thu 11/18 9:48 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Docket Thu 11/18 9:49 AM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included). (ln)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 11/18 9:47 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jerome Elmer Graff. (ln)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/18 9:46 AM
COMPLAINT against O'Reilly's Automotive Inc. filed by Jerome Elmer Graff.(ln)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Notice of Right to Sue