New Jersey District Court
Judge:Claire C Cecchi
Referred: Michael A Hammer
Case #: 2:14-cv-05060
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause42:9613 CERCLA
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2014
Re-opened:Oct 17, 2018
Terminated:Aug 26, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 15, 2015 2:58 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Neglia Engineering Associates
Represented By
DANIEL JAMES COGAN
Hoagland, Longo, Moran, Dunst & Doukas, LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
A.P. NEW JERSEY, INC.
Represented By
MICHAEL E. WALLER
Kirkpatrick & Lockhart Preston Gates Ellis
contact info
Counter Claimant
FRED A. DAIBES
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
WATERSIDE CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
NORTH RIVER MEWS ASSOCIATES, LLC.
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
DAIBES BROTHERS, INC.
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By
MICHAEL E. WALLER
Kirkpatrick & Lockhart Preston Gates Ellis
contact info
Counter Claimant
TERMS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
DAVID R. PIERCE
Lindabury, Mccormick & Estabrook, PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
38 COACH, LLC
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
DAIBES BROTHERS, INC.
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
WATERSIDE CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
BOROUGH OF EDGEWATER
Represented By
TIMOTHY E. CORRISTON
Connell Foley, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
NORTH RIVER MEWS ASSOCIATES, LLC.
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
FRED A. DAIBES
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
38 COACH, LLC
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
Cross Claimant
ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By
MICHAEL E. WALLER
Kirkpatrick & Lockhart Preston Gates Ellis
contact info
Cross Claimant
38 COACH, LLC
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Cross Claimant
DAIBES BROTHERS, INC.
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Cross Claimant
Neglia Engineering Associates
Represented By
DANIEL JAMES COGAN
Hoagland, Longo, Moran, Dunst & Doukas, LLP
contact info
Cross Claimant
FRED A. DAIBES
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Cross Claimant
A.P. NEW JERSEY, INC.
Represented By
MICHAEL E. WALLER
Kirkpatrick & Lockhart Preston Gates Ellis
contact info
Cross Claimant
NORTH RIVER MEWS ASSOCIATES, LLC.
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Cross Claimant
TERMS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
DAVID R. PIERCE
Lindabury, Mccormick & Estabrook, PC
contact info
Cross Claimant
WATERSIDE CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Cross Claimant
COUNTY OF BERGEN, NEW JERSEY
Represented By
KIRSTIN BOHN
Chasan Leyner & Lamparello PC
contact info
MICHAEL DAVID WITT
Chasan Leyner & Lamparello, PC
contact info
Cross Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-100
Cross Defendant
RIVER ROAD IMPROVEMENT PHASE II, INC.
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Cross Defendant
DAIBES BROTHERS, INC.
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
Cross Defendant
NORTH RIVER MEWS ASSOCIATES, LLC.
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
Cross Defendant
TERMS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
DAVID R. PIERCE
Lindabury, Mccormick & Estabrook, PC
contact info
Cross Defendant
WATERSIDE CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Neglia Engineering Associates
Represented By
DANIEL JAMES COGAN
Hoagland, Longo, Moran, Dunst & Doukas, LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By
MICHAEL E. WALLER
Kirkpatrick & Lockhart Preston Gates Ellis
contact info
Cross Defendant
ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100
Cross Defendant
A.P. NEW JERSEY, INC.
Represented By
MICHAEL E. WALLER
Kirkpatrick & Lockhart Preston Gates Ellis
contact info
Cross Defendant
38 COACH, LLC
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
Cross Defendant
FRED A. DAIBES
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
Defendant
NORTH RIVER MEWS ASSOCIATES, LLC.
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
Defendant
38 COACH, LLC
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
Defendant
A.P. NEW JERSEY, INC.
Represented By
MICHAEL E. WALLER
Kirkpatrick & Lockhart Preston Gates Ellis
contact info
MICHAEL STEVEN KETTLER
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Defendant
ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100
Defendant
ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By
MICHAEL E. WALLER
Kirkpatrick & Lockhart Preston Gates Ellis
contact info
MICHAEL STEVEN KETTLER
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Defendant
FRED A. DAIBES
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
Defendant
DAIBES BROTHERS, INC.
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-100
Defendant
RIVER ROAD IMPROVEMENT PHASE II, INC.
Defendant
TERMS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
DAVID R. PIERCE
Lindabury, Mccormick & Estabrook, PC
contact info
Defendant
WATERSIDE CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
Defendant
COUNTY OF BERGEN, NEW JERSEY
Plaintiff
BOROUGH OF EDGEWATER
Represented By
TIMOTHY E. CORRISTON
Connell Foley, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
RIVER ROAD IMPROVEMENT PHASE II, INC.
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
NORTH RIVER MEWS ASSOCIATES, LLC.
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Neglia Engineering Associates
34 Park Avenue
Lyndhurst, NJ 07071
Represented By
DANIEL JAMES COGAN
Hoagland, Longo, Moran, Dunst & Doukas, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
COUNTY OF BERGEN, NEW JERSEY
Represented By
KIRSTIN BOHN
Chasan Leyner & Lamparello PC
contact info
MICHAEL DAVID WITT
Chasan Leyner & Lamparello, PC
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
COUNTY OF BERGEN, NEW JERSEY
Represented By
KIRSTIN BOHN
Chasan Leyner & Lamparello PC
contact info
MICHAEL DAVID WITT
Chasan Leyner & Lamparello, PC
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
WATERSIDE CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
NORTH RIVER MEWS ASSOCIATES, LLC.
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
DAIBES BROTHERS, INC.
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
FRED A. DAIBES
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
A.P. NEW JERSEY, INC.
Represented By
MICHAEL E. WALLER
Kirkpatrick & Lockhart Preston Gates Ellis
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
38 COACH, LLC
Represented By
PATRICK PAPALIA
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
DEBRA S. ROSEN
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info

GPO Dec 14 2016
OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 12/14/16. (sr, )
GPO Dec 16 2016
OPINION/ORDER granting 140 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Cmp.; that Plaintiffs shall file the proposed Third Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of this Order; that all of the Defendants shall file a response to the Third Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of the filing of the new Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/16/16. (DD, )
GPO May 03 2017
OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 5/3/17. (sr, )
GPO Jun 30 2021
OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 6/30/2021. (bt, )
GPO Jul 19 2021
OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 7/19/2021. (bt, )
GPO Aug 17 2021
OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 8/17/2021. (bt, )
GPO Aug 18 2021
OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 8/18/2021. (bt, )
GPO Sep 03 2021
OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 9/3/2021. (bt, )
GPO Sep 29 2021
OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 9/29/2021. (bt, )
GPO Feb 24 2022
OPINION & ORDER denying 417 Edgewaters Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 2/24/2022. (bt, )
GPO Apr 29 2022
OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 4/29/2022. (mxw)

Docket last updated: 86 minutes ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
583 583 2 pgs order Order Mon 04/21 3:23 PM
ORDER granting582 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice between Borough of Edgewater, Waterside Entities and Fred Daibes. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/21/2025. (mj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
582 582 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Thu 04/17 12:44 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice between Borough of Edgewater and Waterside Entities & Fred Daibes by BOROUGH OF EDGEWATER. (CORRISTON, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]