Illinois Southern District Court
Judge:Nancy J Rosenstengel
Case #: 3:21-cv-01452
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2021
Terminated:Nov 29, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday May 17, 2022 3:54 AM CDT
Defendant
Carbondale Park District
Represented By
D. Brian Smith
Feirich/mager/green/ryan
contact info
Jonathan A. Mitchell
Feirich/mager/green/ryan
contact info
Mediator
Mediator Stephen Williams
Kuehn, Beasley & Young, P.C. 23 South 1st Street
Belleville, IL 62202
Plaintiff
Michael Day
Represented By
Sarah Jane Hunt
Kennedy Hunt P.C.
contact info
Thomas E. Kennedy, III
Kennedy Hunt P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
41 41 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 11/29 10:06 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/29/2022. (mlp)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
40 40 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 11/28 2:26 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Michael Day. (Matlock, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
order Order 60 Day Wed 09/28 11:28 AM
60 DAY ORDER: The undersigned Chief District Judge has been advised by Mediator Stephen C. Williams that this action is settled in its entirety, but the parties need additional time to finalize the settlement documents. Accordingly, the undersigned Chief District Judge DIRECTS the Clerk of Court, 60 days after this Order is docketed, to ENTER JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, unless otherwise provided in the settlement documents. The parties shall also obey the terms and conditions of the settlement documents, particularly the provision requiring prompt payment of the settlement amount, if said provision exists. If the parties fail to finalize the settlement within the 60-day period, they may -- before that period expires -- move to postpone entry of judgment to a later date. Due to the settlement, the Court CANCELS all settings in this case. Responses due by 11/28/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 9/28/2022. (mlp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
38 38 misc Report of Mandatory Mediation Tue 09/27 12:52 PM
REPORT of Mandatory Mediation - Case Settled by Mediator Stephen Williams. (Williams, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
36 36 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 08/30 11:16 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/30/2022. (mlp)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Terminate Hearings 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 08/30 11:19 AM
ORDER GRANTING32 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Modify Scheduling and Discovery Order. Discovery shall be completed by October 31, 2022. Dispositive motions shall be filed by November 30, 2022. The Presumptive Trial Month is CONTINUED to April 2023. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 3/22/2023 at 2:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/30/2022. (drb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
35 35 motion Protective Order Mon 08/29 4:47 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Carbondale Park District.(Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order
34 34 respm Response to Motion Mon 08/29 10:56 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re32 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Modify Scheduling and Discovery Order filed by Michael Day. (Matlock, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/23 8:58 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff Michael Day shall respond to Defendant Carbondale Park District's32 First Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Modify Scheduling and Discovery Order on or before August 29, 2022. Related [+]. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/23/2022. (mlp)
Related: [-] sponses due by 8/29/2022
Monday, August 22, 2022
32 32 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 08/22 5:19 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Modify Scheduling and Discovery Order by Carbondale Park District. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
notice Notice Regarding Filing Wed 07/27 9:24 AM
NOTICE REGARDING FILING re29 Motion for Extension of Time filed by Carbondale Park District. When documents will contain multiple Attorney signatures, the non-filing Attorney shall include "with consent" in his/her signature. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (kek)
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 07/27 9:40 AM
ORDER GRANTING29 Agreed Motion Seeking Leave of Court to Extend Time for Initial Mandatory Mediation. The deadline for the Mandatory Mediation Session is extended to August 30, 2022. (Mandatory Mediation Session to be completed by 8/30/2022.) Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 7/27/2022. (mlp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
29 29 motion Extension of Time Tue 07/26 4:22 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of the Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Order by Carbondale Park District. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/23 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole A. Matlock on behalf of Michael Day (Matlock, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2022
notice Notice of Modification Mon 03/14 10:19 AM
NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re26 Stipulation Selecting Mediator. The selected mediator was not added to the docket per this Courts instruction. Mediator Stephen C. Williams has been added to the docket and the docket text at entry26 has been modified accordingly. For future reference, please see instructions available on our website, www.ilsd.uscourts.gov, Rules & Forms, Mandatory Mediation Program. No further action is required in relation to this notification. (lmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
26 26 misc Stipulation Selecting Mediator Wed 03/09 1:03 PM
STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. Signed by Jonathan A. Mitchell on behalf, and with consent, of all Counsel of Record on 3/9/2022. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
25 25 order Scheduling Order Fri 02/11 10:50 AM
ORDER ADOPTING JOINT REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY7 ORDER: Discovery due by 8/24/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 9/23/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/11/2022.(drb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Joint Report of Parties
minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 02/11 10:41 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 2/11/2022 with Sarah Hunt and Jonathan Mitchell participating. Due to the filing of the Amended Complaint,13 Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot. The Joint Report of the Parties is accepted. Should a discovery dispute arise, the parties are instructed to file a motion and response. The court will rule on the filings or set a discovery dispute hearing. (Court Reporter n/a.) (drb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 02/08 4:44 PM
ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for 2/11/2022 at 10:30 AM before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 877-336-1831; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 9139610. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/8/2022. (drb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 02/07 1:10 PM
ORDER RESETTING TIME OF HEARING: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference SET for 2/9/2022 will now begin at 1:00 PM before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 877-336-1831 ; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 9139610 . Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/7/2022. (drb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
21 21 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 01/27 8:24 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to20 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Carbondale Park District.(Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/18 2:11 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Carbondale Park District, filed by Michael Day.(Hunt, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 01/05 9:16 AM
ORDER GRANTING18 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Strike. Plaintiff shall respond on or before February 10, 2022. Responses due by 2/10/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/5/2022. (mlp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 01/04 2:18 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs prayer for relief seeking punitive damages, by Michael Day. (Hunt, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
17 17 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 01/03 4:26 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is SET for 2/9/2022 at 1:30 PM before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 877-336-1831 ; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 9139610 . The parties are to submit a Joint Report and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order seven (7) days before the conference via e-mail to NJRpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/3/2022. (drb)
Related: [-]
16 16 order CJRA Track Mon 01/03 4:22 PM
CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2022 at 2:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Presumptive Jury Trial Month set for January 2023.(drb)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Mon 01/03 4:15 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/3/2022. (drb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/28 4:08 PM
Defendant ANSWER to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Carbondale Park District.(Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 27, 2021
13 13 motion Strike Mon 12/27 2:23 PM
MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs prayer for relief seeking punitive damages, by Carbondale Park District. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/15 9:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by D. Brian Smith on behalf of Carbondale Park District (Smith, D.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/13 3:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responsive Pleading by Carbondale Park District. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/13 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A. Mitchell on behalf of Carbondale Park District (Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/13 4:51 PM
ORDER GRANTING10 Motion for Extension to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead on or before December 28, 2021. Responses due by 12/28/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/13/2021. (mlp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/23 11:18 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Day. Carbondale Park District served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Hunt, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 19, 2021
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 11/19 8:13 AM
Summons Issued as to Carbondale Park District, and returned to Attorney Hunt for service. (kls3)
Related: [-]
utility Case Opening Notification Fri 11/19 8:05 AM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-1452-NJR. (kls3)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Regarding Filing Fri 11/19 8:07 AM
NOTICE REGARDING FILING: The submitted Summons is a fillable document. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF documents before filing on CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (kls3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/18 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kennedy, III on behalf of Michael Day (Kennedy, Thomas)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/18 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Jane Hunt on behalf of Michael Day (Hunt, Sarah)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Requested Thu 11/18 12:46 PM
Summons Requested. (Hunt, Sarah)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/18 12:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Carbondale Park District ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4637008.), filed by Michael Day.(Hunt, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet