Washington Eastern District Court
Judge:Stanley A Bastian
Referred: James A Goeke
Case #: 2:21-cv-00325
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2021
Terminated:Apr 09, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 17, 2022 2:09 AM PDT
Defendant
Cedar Builders Inc
Represented By
William H Walsh
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Defendant
Cedar Property Management
Represented By
William H Walsh
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Defendant
Scott Naccarato
Represented By
William H Walsh
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin W Zufall
1203 N. Margaret Ave.
Deer Park, WA 99006
Represented By
Andrew Sean Biviano
Law Office Of Andrew S. Biviano
contact info
Plaintiff
Tamara S Zufall
Represented By
Andrew Sean Biviano
Law Office Of Andrew S. Biviano
contact info

GPO Jul 20 2022
ORDER ADOPTING 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER; The Protective Order is APPROVED, ADOPTED, and INCORPORATED. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (MRJ, Case Administrator)
GPO Dec 16 2022
ORDER DENYING 28 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (REM, Case Administrator)
GPO Apr 09 2024
ORDER GRANTING 91 STIPULATED DISMISSAL. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 41(a)(1)(B), the above-captioned action is DISMISSED with prejudice. All pending motions are DISMISSED as moot. The Jury Trial set for 5/6/2024 and all associated deadlines, are STRICKEN. File CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (WMK, Case Administrator)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
92 92 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 04/09 4:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING91 STIPULATED DISMISSAL. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 41(a)(1)(B), the above-captioned action is DISMISSED with prejudice. All pending motions are DISMISSED as moot. The Jury Trial set for 5/6/2024 and all associated deadlines, are STRICKEN. File CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (WMK, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
91 91 motion Dismiss Tue 04/09 11:50 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2024 Without Oral Argument before Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (Walsh, William)
Related: [-]