Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Marc Thomas Treadwell
Case #: 5:14-cv-00298
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Aug 13, 2014
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 1:31 PM EDT
Defendant
WINSTON R JESHURAN , II
Represented By
Canon Brown Hill
Jones Cork & Miller, LLP
contact info
Sharon H. Reeves
contact info
Defendant
THE MACON ORTHOPAEDIC AND HAND CENTER PA
Represented By
FRANK L BUTLER, III
Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete, LLP
contact info
ALYSSA K PETERS
Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CYNTHIA HUNT
Represented By
ALEXANDER C MACINNES
contact info
JENNIFER HUBBARD
contact info
REGINA S MOLDEN
contact info

GPO Feb 17 2015
ORDER DENYING 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 2/17/2015. (tlh)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 21, 2015
28 28 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 07/21 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CYNTHIA HUNT (MOLDEN, REGINA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 09, 2015
26 26 order Scheduling/Discovery Order Thu 04/09 2:50 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER : Discovery to be complete by 9/15/2015. Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 10/15/2015. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 4/9/2015. (tlh)
Related: [-]
misc Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order Received Thu 04/09 9:44 AM
Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order Received and forwarded to Chambers (cma)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Seal Document Thu 04/09 2:45 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER GRANTING24 Motion to Seal Document. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 4/9/2015. (tlh)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 04/09 2:47 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER GRANTING25 Motion to Stay. The case is stayed until 6/15/2015. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 4/9/2015. (tlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 08, 2015
25 25 motion Stay Wed 04/08 5:21 PM
MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Until June 15, 2015 by WINSTON R JESHURAN, II filed by Sharon H. Reeves. Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, Sharon
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Joint Proposed Amendment to Scheduling and Discovery Order
24 24 motion Seal Document(s) Wed 04/08 5:02 PM
MOTION to Seal Document(s) by WINSTON R JESHURAN, II filed by Sharon H. Reeves Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, Sharon
Friday, March 27, 2015
23 23 discov Discovery Status Report Fri 03/27 1:31 PM
Discovery Status Report by WINSTON R JESHURAN, II Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, Sharon
Tuesday, March 17, 2015
22 22 discov Discovery Order Memorandum Tue 03/17 3:20 PM
Discovery Order Memorandum(cma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 17, 2015
21 21 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 02/17 10:31 AM
ORDER DENYING10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 2/17/2015. (tlh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 26, 2015
20 20 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 01/26 3:32 PM
CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 1/26/2015. (tlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 23, 2015
19 19 motion Protective Order Fri 01/23 11:52 AM
MOTION for Protective Order by THE MACON ORTHOPAEDIC AND HAND CENTER PA filed by ALYSSA K PETERS.(PETERS, ALYSSA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 19, 2014
18 18 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 12/19 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JENNIFER HUBBARD on behalf of CYNTHIA HUNT Attorney JENNIFER HUBBARD added to party CYNTHIA HUNT(pty:pla) (HUBBARD, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 05, 2014
17 17 order Scheduling/Discovery Order Fri 12/05 1:59 PM
SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 6/3/2015. Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 7/6/2015. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 12/5/2014. (tlh)
Related: [-]
misc Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order Received Fri 12/05 1:12 PM
Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order Received and forwarded to Chambers (cma)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 24, 2014
16 16 ***Arbitration Opt Out Letter by Defendant (BUTLER, FRANK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 20, 2014
15 15 ***Arbitration Opt Out Letter by Defendant Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, Sharon
14 14 RESPONSE filed by CYNTHIA HUNT re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (MOLDEN, REGINA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 12, 2014
13 13 Arbitration Referral Letter sent 11/12/2014 (hrm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 05, 2014
12 12 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order due 12/5/2014. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 11/5/2014.. (tlh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Required Form,
Att: 2 Required Form - The Security National Bank of Sioux City, Iowa v. Abbott Laboratories, 2014 WL 3704277 (N.D. Iowa)
Monday, November 03, 2014
11 11 11 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support filed by WINSTON R JESHURAN, II re:10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, Sharon
10 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by WINSTON R JESHURAN, II filed by Sharon H. Reeves Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, Sharon
9 9 ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by WINSTON R JESHURAN, II Related [+]Attorney Sharon H. Reeves added to party WINSTON R JESHURAN, II(pty:dft)
Related: [-] eves, Sharon
8 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by FRANK L BUTLER, III on behalf of THE MACON ORTHOPAEDIC AND HAND CENTER PA Attorney FRANK L BUTLER, III added to party THE MACON ORTHOPAEDIC AND HAND CENTER PA(pty:dft) (BUTLER, FRANK)
Related: [-]
7 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE MACON ORTHOPAEDIC AND HAND CENTER PA (PETERS, ALYSSA)
Related: [-]
6 6 ANSWER to1 Complaint by THE MACON ORTHOPAEDIC AND HAND CENTER PA.(PETERS, ALYSSA)Attorney ALYSSA K PETERS added to party THE MACON ORTHOPAEDIC AND HAND CENTER PA(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 06, 2014
5 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CYNTHIA HUNT. as to THE MACON ORTHOPAEDIC AND HAND CENTER PA (MOLDEN, REGINA)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 19, 2014
4 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CYNTHIA HUNT. as to WINSTON R JESHURAN, II (MOLDEN, REGINA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 13, 2014
3 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CYNTHIA HUNT (cma)
Related: [-]
2 2 Summons Issued as to WINSTON R JESHURAN, II on 8/13/2014; THE MACON ORTHOPAEDIC AND HAND CENTER PA on 8/13/2014.(cma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Winston R. Jeshuran II
1 1 COMPLAINT against WINSTON R JESHURAN, II and THE MACON ORTHOPAEDIC AND HAND CENTER PA Filing Fee $ 400, Receipt Number 113G-1898604 filed by CYNTHIA HUNT.(cma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet