California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Thurston
Referred: Christopher D Baker
Case #: 1:21-cv-01673
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2021
Case in other court:Kern County Superior Court, BCV-21-102423
Last checked: Tuesday May 17, 2022 1:50 AM PDT
Defendant
Aerotek, Inc.,
Represented By
Michael S. Kun
Epstein Becker And Green
contact info
Defendant
Caterpillar Inc.
Represented By
Andrew S. Rosenman
Mayer Brown, LLP
contact info
Sean A. Flores
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Diana Vega Zamudio
Represented By
Edwin Pairavi
Pairavi Law, P.C.
contact info

GPO Jan 04 2022
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADJUST BRIEFING DEADLINES FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on January 4, 2022. (Munoz, I)
GPO Feb 15 2022
ORDER DENYING 4 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/14/2022. (Jessen, A)
GPO Oct 13 2023
ORDER DENYING 16 Motion to Compel signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/12/2023. (Lundstrom, T)
GPO Nov 17 2023
SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 11/17/2023. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 5/22/2024; Expert 7/26/2024. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/8/2024 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield (CDB) before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 8/9/2024. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/27/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 3/11/2025 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
GPO Feb 29 2024
ORDER GRANTING 4349 Defendants' Motions to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Compel Arbitration, signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 2/28/2024. (Hall, S)
GPO May 08 2024
ORDER GRANTING 41 Motion of Defendant Aerotek, Inc., to Compel Arbitration, signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 5/8/2024. Case Stayed. Joint status report due 6/18/2024. (Hall, S)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
64 64 misc Status Report Mon 04/07 4:39 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Caterpillar Inc.. (Rosenman, Andrew)
Related: [-]